Scoggins v. Wise et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Scoggins
Defendant: Gregory Wise and G E O Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2014cv00573
Filed: March 17, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Claiborne
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 15 Report and Recommendations: IT IS ORDERED that the remainder of Scoggins' claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in accordance with the provisions of FED.R.CIV.P.41(b). Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on May 23, 2016. (crt,Benoit, T)
March 14, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 33 Report and Recommendations; IT IS ORDERED that Nail and Hunter's 31 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED for the claim relating to denial of records, and that this claim be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 3/4/2016. (crt,FinnSld, P)
August 17, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 19 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's 1 Complaint and 7 Amended Complaint be and hereby are DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failing to state a claim. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 8/13/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P)
July 7, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING DENYING 10 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 9 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Antonio Scoggins. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 7/1/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scoggins v. Wise et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Scoggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G E O Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?