Davis v. Rogers

Plaintiff: Robyn Little Davis
Defendant: James Rogers
Case Number: 2:2015cv00562
Filed: March 6, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion for Certificate of Appealability re 42 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 11/7/2016. (crt,Haik, K)
October 6, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 33 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robyn Little Davis, be and hereby is DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on October 4, 2016. (crt,Benoit, T)
April 18, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: Davis is given 14 days from the date of this order to either move for a stay while she pursues her unexhausted claims in state court or to file an amended petition deleting her unexhausted claims and proceeding with the exhausted claims. If she chooses the latter option, she should more accurately phrase her habeas claims in order for this court to reconsider them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 4/18/2016. (crt,Haik, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Little Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?