Ackley v. Honeywell International Inc

Plaintiff: Kevin A Ackley
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Case Number: 2:2015cv01188
Filed: April 14, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING regarding 35 Motion to Compel filed by defendant Honeywell International Inc. Defendant also seeks attorney's fees and costs incurred in bringing this Motion. For the following reasons, defendant's 35 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. The 35 Motion for Costs and Attorneys Fees is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/31/2017. (crt,Putch, A)
April 28, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 18 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Honeywell International Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on April 25, 2016. (crt,Benoit, T)
August 17, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Honeywell International Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 8/13/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ackley v. Honeywell International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin A Ackley
Represented By: Edward J Fonti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Represented By: Lindsey Harreld Chopin
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?