Alfred McZeal v. MidSouth National Bank N A et al
Plaintiff: |
Alfred McZeal |
Defendant: |
MidSouth National Bank N A, MidSouth Bancorp Inc, L J Angelle, C R Rusty Cloutier, James R McLemore, Jr, Troy M Cloutier, Jeffery L Blum and Will Charbonnet, Sr |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv02315 |
Filed: |
September 1, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Lake Charles Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Kathleen Kay |
Presiding Judge: |
Patricia Minaldi |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 10, 2017 |
Filing
92
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 86 Motion for Bill of Costs. It is Ordered that attorneys' fees and costs be awarded to the defendants in the sum totaling $10,527.29. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 7/10/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
|
April 19, 2017 |
Filing
85
JUDGMENT adopting 83 Report and Recommendations. It is Ordered that the clerk place Alfred McZeal on the list of sanctioned/barred litigants for this district. Defendants are to submit an itemized bill of the costs and attorney's fees incurr ed in this matter within fourteen days. Plaintiff will have fourteen days from when the defendants submit an itemized bill to raise any objections to amounts in the bill. Plaintiff will pay defendant what the court determines are reasonable costs and attorney's fees. Mr. McZeal is enjoined from filing any further motions in this action beyond a notice of appeal to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeal, and will face appropriate sanctions for a violation. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 4/19/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
|
August 23, 2016 |
Filing
52
JUDGMENT ADOPTING 51 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that, 34 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; 39 Motion to Take Judicial Notice is DENIED; 49 Motion to Strike is DENIED; 50 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on August 19, 2016. (crt,Benoit, T)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Alfred McZeal v. MidSouth National Bank N A et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Alfred McZeal |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: MidSouth National Bank N A |
Represented By: |
Lynward J Angelle, Jr |
Represented By: |
Elissa D Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: MidSouth Bancorp Inc |
Represented By: |
Lynward J Angelle, Jr |
Represented By: |
Elissa D Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: L J Angelle |
Represented By: |
Lynward J Angelle, Jr |
Represented By: |
Elissa D Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: C R Rusty Cloutier |
Represented By: |
Lynward J Angelle, Jr |
Represented By: |
Elissa D Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: James R McLemore, Jr |
Represented By: |
Lynward J Angelle, Jr |
Represented By: |
Elissa D Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Troy M Cloutier |
Represented By: |
Lynward J Angelle, Jr |
Represented By: |
Elissa D Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jeffery L Blum |
Represented By: |
Lynward J Angelle, Jr |
Represented By: |
Elissa D Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Will Charbonnet, Sr |
Represented By: |
Lynward J Angelle, Jr |
Represented By: |
Elissa D Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?