Fontenot v. Safety Council of Southwest Louisiana

Plaintiff: Joni Fontenot
Defendant: Safety Council of Southwest Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2016cv00084
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Beauregard
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2017 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Report and Testimony of Betty Raglin. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/16/2017. (crt,Whidden, C)
August 14, 2017 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion in Limine to Exclude Portions of John McDonald's Expert Report. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/14/2017. (crt,Whidden, C)
August 9, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Compel; denying 54 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Safety Council shall comply with this order within five (5) days of the date of signature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/9/2017. (crt,Keller, J)
August 8, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony that Joni Fontenot was Happy with her Pay and Free to Reject the Offer of Employment. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/8/2017. (crt,Whidden, C)
July 21, 2017 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion to Realign the Parties. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/21/2017. (crt,Whidden, C)
June 28, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/28/2017. (crt,Whidden, C)
June 23, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion to Strike to the extent that it requests that the Court strike the last paragraph of Fontenots affidavit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Safety Councils Motion to Strike is DENIED as MOOT to the extent that it requests the Court to strike the rough draft of the deposition transcript of Joe A. Andrepont.Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/23/2017. (crt,Reeves, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontenot v. Safety Council of Southwest Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Council of Southwest Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joni Fontenot
Represented By: Timothy O'Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?