Fontenot v. Hudson Insurance Group et al

Plaintiff: Jeremi J Fontenot
Defendant: William Rodolfo Gonzales and Hudson Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2016cv00584
Filed: April 28, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding 26 Motion in Limine. For the foregoing reasons, the Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as described herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/7/2017. (crt,Putch, A)
September 14, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 23 Report and Recommendations; granting 19 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 9/14/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
August 23, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 12 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that 8 Fontenot's Motion to Remand is DENIED. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on August 19, 2016. (crt,Benoit, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontenot v. Hudson Insurance Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rodolfo Gonzales
Represented By: Van Clifton Seneca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Co
Represented By: Van Clifton Seneca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremi J Fontenot
Represented By: Claude Pierson Devall
Represented By: John Lee Hoffoss, Jr
Represented By: Bobby Holmes
Represented By: Donald W McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?