Laird v. Cain

Plaintiff: Wilks Laird
Defendant: Nate Cain
Case Number: 2:2016cv00755
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Avoyelles
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 27 Report and Recommendations, denying 24 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing; dismissing petition with prejudice. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 8/23/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 6, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In order for this court to properly determine statutory tolling of the instant petition, it is necessary for us to consider whether the second application was ultimately rejected by the state courts as untimely. Accordingly, the parties are given 30 days from the date of this order to submit supplementary briefs addressing the disposition of the second application for post-conviction relief and its impact on timeliness of the instant petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/6/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 7, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend petition. Pro Se Response due by 10/17/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/7/2016. (crt,Haik, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laird v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilks Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?