Cameron et al v. Auster Oil & Gas Inc et al
Plaintiff: Parish of Cameron
Defendant: Texas Co, Auster Oil & Gas Inc, Star Energy Inc, Resource Securities Corp, Texas Petroleum Investment Co, Enervest Operating L L C, Apache Corp, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, BP America Production Company, Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore L P, Vernon E Faulconer Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Gulfport Energy Corp, Shell Oil Co, Texas Pacific Oil Co Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Freeport Sulphur Co, Hilcorp Energy Co, Swepi L P, Taylor Energy Co L L C, Transcontinental Oil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Samuel Gary Jr & Associates Inc, Honeywell International Inc, Darsey Operating Corp and B P America Production Co
Intervenor Plaintiff: LA Attorney General, LA Dept of Natural Resources and State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2018cv00677
Filed: May 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Cameron
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 146 RESPONSE to Motion re #145 Ex Parte MOTION for Hearing filed by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co, Texas Co, Exxon Mobile Corp, B P America Production Co, Swepi L P, Shell Oil Co and Shell Offshore Inc. (aty,White, Alexandra) Modified filers on 9/12/2019 (Bunting, M).
September 3, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #145 Ex Parte MOTION for Hearing . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 30, 2019 Filing 145 Ex Parte MOTION for Hearing by Parish of Cameron, State of Louisiana(ex rel), State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Memorandum in Support of Joint Ex Parte Motion of Plaintiffs and Intervenors for In-Person Status Conference)(aty,Marcello, Victor)
June 18, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co of Supplemental Authority re #67 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(crt,Bunting, M)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #142 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/18/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
June 12, 2019 Filing 142 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority with consent by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed Exhibit 1 to notice of supplemental authority)(aty,Mascari, Pamela) Modified docket text on 6/12/2019 (Bunting, M).
May 30, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Parish of Cameron, State of Louisiana(ex rel), State of Louisiana re #67 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(crt,Bunting, M)
May 30, 2019 Filing 140 REPLY to Plaintiff's Response to Supplemental Submission re #67 MOTION to Remand filed by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #137 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by Parish of Cameron, State of Louisiana(ex rel), State of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/30/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #134 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Supplemental Submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/30/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
May 29, 2019 Filing 137 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority with consent by Parish of Cameron, State of Louisiana(ex rel), State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed Pleading - Notice of Supplemental Authority, #3 Exhibit 1 - Order and Reasons)(aty,Martin, Christopher) Modified docket text on 5/29/2019 (Bunting, M).
May 21, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(aty,White, Alexandra) Modified docket text on 5/22/2019 (Bunting, M).
April 25, 2019 Filing 135 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #67 MOTION to Remand filed by Parish of Cameron, State of Louisiana(ex rel), State of Louisiana. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 25, 2019 Filing 134 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Supplemental Submission with consent by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,White, Alexandra)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #132 Motion for Leave of Plaintiffs and Intervenors to File Response to Chevron's Supplemental Opposition to Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 4/24/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
April 23, 2019 Filing 132 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Chevron's Supplemental Opposition to Motion to Remand with consent by Parish of Cameron, State of Louisiana(ex rel), State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed pleading - Response to Chevron's Supplemental Opposition to Motion to Remand)(aty,Martin, Christopher)
April 16, 2019 Filing 131 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #67 MOTION to Remand filed by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(crt,Bunting, M)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #129 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Submission in Opposition to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 4/16/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
April 12, 2019 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Submission in Opposition to Remand with consent sought but not yet obtained by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading Exh A, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,White, Alexandra)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #126 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Wesley Alan Romero for Parish of Cameron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/28/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
January 24, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Misc Hearing on Opposition to Report and Recommendation held on 1/16/2019 before Judge Robert Summerhays. Court Reporter/Transcriber DD Juranka, Telephone number (337)214-6669. Total pages: 101. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 2/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2019. (crt,Juranka, D)
January 22, 2019 Filing 126 MOTION for Wesley A. Romero to Enroll as Counsel by Parish of Cameron. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Mudd, Chad)
January 16, 2019 Filing 125 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Robert R Summerhays: MISCELLANEOUS HEARING re: oral argument on #104 Objection to Report and Recommendation held on 1/16/2019. The matter was taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: DD Juranka) (crt,Benoit, T)
January 15, 2019 Filing 124 REPLY in Support of Objections re #103 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #67 MOTION to Remand filed by Parish of Cameron, #71 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by LA Dept of Natural Resources, LA Attorney General filed by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(crt,Bunting, M)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #119 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 1/15/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #118 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Donald W Price for LA Dept of Natural Resources. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/15/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 14, 2019 Filing 121 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION to Withdraw Michelle M. White as Attorney by LA Attorney General. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Seidemann, Ryan) Modified to reflect filed in error on 1/14/2019 (Bunting, M).
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #117 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Laura Springer Brown for Shell Offshore Inc,Laura Springer Brown for Shell Oil Co, Laura Springer Brown for Swepi L P. Attorney Dana M Douglas terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/10/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 10, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #119 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Objections to Report and Recommendation with consent . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 10, 2019 Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Objections to Report and Recommendation with consent by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defs' Motion for Leave, #2 Proposed order on Defendants' Motion for Leave)(aty,White, Alexandra)
January 10, 2019 Filing 118 MOTION for Donald Price to Enroll as Counsel by LA Dept of Natural Resources. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Terrell, Megan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 117 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Attorney Laura Springer Brown in place of Dana M. Douglas by Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Becker, Kelly)
January 4, 2019 Filing 116 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Exhibit A (corrected page 20, document #111 ) filed by Parish of Cameron, LA Dept of Natural Resources regarding #111 Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 1/4/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 3, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #114 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Page of Their Joint Reply Mem Doc 111, pg 20. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Reeves, T)
January 3, 2019 Filing 114 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Page of Their Joint Reply Mem Doc 111, pg 20 by LA Attorney General, Parish of Cameron, LA Dept of Natural Resources. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed exhibit) Modified on 1/3/2019 to remove incorrect attorney/party association made by Victor Marcello (Reeves, T).
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #112 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Peter D Keisler for Chevron Pipe Line Co,Peter D Keisler for Chevron U S A Holdings Inc,Peter D Keisler for Chevron U S A Inc,Peter D Keisler for Texas Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/27/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 19, 2018 Filing 112 Ex Parte MOTION for Peter D. Keisler to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3834507) by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Mascari, Pamela)
December 18, 2018 Filing 111 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #103 Report and Recommendations Joint Reply Memo in Response by LA Attorney General, Parish of Cameron, LA Dept of Natural Resources. (aty,Marcello, Victor) Modified to remove attorney erroneously added to party on 12/18/2018 (Bunting, M).
December 17, 2018 Filing 110 MINUTE ENTRY: re #104 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation, filed by B P America Production Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Swepi L P, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Shell Oil Co, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co, Shell Offshore Inc, Oral Argument is set for 1/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Lake Charles Court House before Judge Robert R Summerhays.Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 12/17/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #105 Motion Oral Argument of Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 12/14/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 12, 2018 Filing 108 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #105 MOTION Oral Argument re #104 Response in Opposition (NOT Motions) filed by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(crt,Bunting, M)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 12/12/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 11, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #106 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Request for Oral Argument with consent . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 11, 2018 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Request for Oral Argument with consent by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Request for Oral Argument, #3 Proposed Exhibit A to Supplemental Memorandum Re Oral Argument)(aty,Stern, Martin) Modified docket text on 12/11/2018 (Bunting, M).
December 6, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #105 MOTION Oral Argument re #104 Response in Opposition (NOT Motions). Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 4, 2018 Filing 105 MOTION Oral Argument re #104 Response in Opposition (NOT Motions),, by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order to Defendants' Request for Oral Argument of Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendation)(aty,White, Alexandra)
December 4, 2018 Filing 104 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed as RESPONSE in Opposition by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co re #103 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #67 MOTION to Remand filed by Parish of Cameron, #71 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by LA Dept of Natural Resources, LA Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support of Objections to Report and Recommendation)(aty,White, Alexandra) Modified docket text on 12/6/2018 (Bunting, M).
November 20, 2018 Filing 103 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS RECOMMENDED that #67 MOTION to Remand filed by Parish of Cameron, #71 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by LA Dept of Natural Resources, LA Attorney General be GRANTED and that this matter be remanded to the 38th Judicial District Court, Cameron Parish, Louisiana. Objections to R&R due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/20/2018. (crt,LaCombe, L)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #99 Motion for Hearing. The issues have been thoroughly briefed and we do not find at this time that oral argument would be helpful. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/18/2018. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
October 16, 2018 Filing 101 REPLY to Response to Motion re #67 MOTION to Remand , #71 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by LA Attorney General, Parish of Cameron, LA Dept of Natural Resources. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit)(aty,Marcello, Victor)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/10/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 10, 2018 Filing 99 MOTION for Hearing re #67 MOTION to Remand , #71 Joint MOTION to Remand by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,White, Alexandra)
October 9, 2018 Filing 98 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by LA Attorney General, Parish of Cameron, LA Dept of Natural Resources. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Marcello, Victor)
October 1, 2018 Filing 97 RESPONSE to Motion re #67 Motion to Remand, #71 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 85, #85 Exhibit 86, #86 Exhibit 87, #87 Exhibit 88, #88 Exhibit 89, #89 Exhibit 90, #90 Exhibit 91, #91 Exhibit 92, #92 Exhibit 93, #93 Exhibit 94, #94 Exhibit 95, #95 Exhibit 96, #96 Exhibit 97, #97 Exhibit 98, #98 Exhibit 99, #99 Exhibit 100, #100 Exhibit 101, #101 Exhibit 102, #102 Exhibit 103, #103 Exhibit 104, #104 Exhibit 105, #105 Exhibit 106, #106 Exhibit 107, #107 Exhibit 108, #108 Exhibit 109, #109 Exhibit 110, #110 Exhibit 111, #111 Exhibit 112, #112 Exhibit 113, #113 Exhibit 114, #114 Exhibit 115, #115 Exhibit 116, #116 Exhibit 118, #117 Exhibit 119, #118 Exhibit 120, #119 Exhibit 121, #120 Exhibit 122, #121 Exhibit 123, #122 Exhibit 124, #123 Exhibit 125, #124 Exhibit 126, #125 Exhibit 127, #126 Exhibit 128, #127 Exhibit 130, #128 Exhibit 131, #129 Exhibit 132, #130 Exhibit 133, #131 Exhibit 134, #132 Exhibit 135, #133 Exhibit 136, #134 Exhibit 137, #135 Exhibit 138, #136 Exhibit 139, #137 Exhibit 140, #138 Exhibit 141, #139 Exhibit 142, #140 Exhibit 143, #141 Exhibit 144, #142 Exhibit 145, #143 Exhibit 146, #144 Exhibit 147, #145 Exhibit 148, #146 Exhibit 150, #147 Exhibit 151, #148 Exhibit 152, #149 Exhibit 153, #150 Exhibit 154, #151 Exhibit Defendants' Request for Oral Argument)(aty,White, Alexandra) Modified on 10/9/2018 to modify docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
October 1, 2018 Filing 96 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk: Matter is hereby reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Judge Dee D Drell no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/28/2018. (crt,Dunford, T)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: Considering the assignment of new judicial officers, this case is transferred to the Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 9/28/2018. (crt,Dunford, T)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Shannon Alicia Shelton terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/7/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 6, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION to Withdraw Shannon A. Shelton as Attorney by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Juneau, Claire)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #90 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Matthew T Heartney for B P America Production Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/6/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #89 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Nancy G Milburn for B P America Production Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/6/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 5, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION for Matthew T. Heartney to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3744848) by B P America Production Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Norman, Joe)
September 5, 2018 Filing 89 MOTION for Nancy G. Milburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3744808) by B P America Production Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Norman, Joe)
August 31, 2018 Filing 88 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Norman, Joe)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ELECTRONIC ORDER ISSUED TO CLARIFY BRIEFING DEADLINES: Responses to the Motion to Remand in this matter are due within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. A reply is due within fifteen (15) days after the filing of the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/30/2018. (crt,Benoit, T)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages that Defendants may file a single memorandum in opposition to the pending motion to remand not to exceed fifty (50) pages. FURTHER ORDERED the motion is GRANTED and that briefing on pending motions to remand (Rec. Docs. 67 and 71) shall proceed in this lowest numbered case and that the matters bearing Docket Numbers: 18-678, 18-679, 18-682, 18-684, 18-685, 18-686, 18-687, 18-688, 18-689,18-690 and 18-691 be STAYED pending final resolution of the pending motions to remand in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/29/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 29, 2018 Filing 85 VACATED - NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #67 MOTION to Remand , #71 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Benoit, T) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add VACATED. See document #87 (Benoit, T).
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #83 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply of Plaintiffs and Intervenors in Opposition to Motion for Staged Briefing and Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/29/2018. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
August 24, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #83 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply of Plaintiffs and Intervenors in Opposition to Motion for Staged Briefing and Stay with opposition. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 24, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply of Plaintiffs and Intervenors in Opposition to Motion for Staged Briefing and Stay with opposition by LA Attorney General, Parish of Cameron, LA Dept of Natural Resources. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of Opposition, #3 Proposed pleading, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(aty,Marcello, Victor)
August 23, 2018 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re #80 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and for Staged Briefing in this Lowest Number Case filed by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(aty,Mascari, Pamela)
August 22, 2018 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #80 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and for Staged Briefing in this Lowest Number Case filed by LA Attorney General, Parish of Cameron, LA Dept of Natural Resources. (aty,Marcello, Victor)
August 21, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #71 Joint MOTION to Remand, #67 MOTION to Remand. Per chambers instructions, motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,LaCombe, L)
August 21, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #71 Joint MOTION to Remand, #67 MOTION to Remand. Per chambers instructions, Motions to Remand are referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,LaCombe, L)
August 20, 2018 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and for Staged Briefing in this Lowest Number Case by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Mascari, Pamela)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Responses to the Motion to Remand are due within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. To the extent practicable the parties opposing the remand are to coordinate and consolidate their arguments into one brief to be filed in each pending case. A reply will be due within fifteen (15) days after the filing of the response. The parties moving to remand are also ordered to coordinate and consolidate any reply brief and file the brief in each pending case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/14/2018. (crt,Solari, E)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 8/11/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 31, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Order Denying Transfer in MDL No.2856, IN RE: Louisiana Coastal Zone Land Loss Litigation. (crt,Whidden, C)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re #52 Order on Motion to Stay, #67 MOTION to Remand, #71 Joint MOTION to Remand it is hereby ORDERED no briefing is allowed on any pending motion for remand nor will any be accepted. Any briefing dates set in any notice by the Clerk in advance of action by the Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation, including a notice of motion setting, shall be ignored by counsel. Except for the allowance for filing of certain motions to remand by separate order, all matters, once again, are STAYED. No other permission to lift the stay or make other filings shall be inferred by any party, nor implied from prior court orders authorizing limited relief to file motions to remand. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 6/26/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 22, 2018 Filing 75 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: All Notices of Motion Setting are VACATED as this case is stayed. (crt,Crick, S)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #69 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/22/2018. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 73 VACATED - NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #71 Joint MOTION to Remand. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified to reflect vacated on 6/27/2018 (Bunting, M).
June 21, 2018 Filing 72 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Consent to Withdrawal filed by LA Attorney General regarding #69 MOTION to Withdraw Elizabeth B. Murrill as Attorney , #70 Notice of Deficiency, . (aty,Seidemann, Ryan)
June 21, 2018 Filing 71 Joint MOTION to Remand by LA Attorney General, LA Dept of Natural Resources. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 16, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 16, #5 Exhibit 1 Part 3 of 16, #6 Exhibit 1 Part 4 of 16, #7 Exhibit 1 Part 5 of 16, #8 Exhibit 1 Part 6 of 16, #9 Exhibit 1 Part 7 of 16, #10 Exhibit 1 Part 8 of 16, #11 Exhibit 1 Part 9 of 16, #12 Exhibit 1 Part 10 of 16, #13 Exhibit 1 Part 11 of 16, #14 Exhibit 1 Part 12 of 16, #15 Exhibit 1 Part 13 of 16, #16 Exhibit 1 Part 14 of 16, #17 Exhibit 1 Part 15 of 16, #18 Exhibit 1 Part 16 of 16, #19 Exhibits 2 - 4)(aty,Price, Donald)
June 20, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Deficiency to Ryan Michael Seidemann on behalf of LA Attorney General regarding #69 MOTION to Withdraw Elizabeth B. Murrill as Attorney. Reason: A motion to withdraw or to substitute counsel must be signed by or have consent of the withdrawing attorney. (Please also refer to LR5.7.08 regarding electronic filing of documents requiring signatures of more than one party.) The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 20, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION to Withdraw Elizabeth B. Murrill as Attorney by LA Attorney General. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Seidemann, Ryan) Modified to reflect deficient status on 6/20/2018 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficient status on 6/21/2018 (Bunting, M). See document #72 for consent.
June 20, 2018 Filing 68 VACATED: NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #67 MOTION to Remand. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified on 6/22/2018 to indicated vacated (Benoit, T).
June 19, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to Remand by Parish of Cameron. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit 1 part 1 of 3, #4 Exhibit 1 part 2 of 3, #5 Exhibit 1 part 3 of 3, #6 Exhibit 2 - 13)(aty,Marcello, Victor)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Lift Stay only for the limited purpose of allowing Plaintiff and Plaintiff-Intervenors to file a motion to remand within 30 days of the notice of removal. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 6/15/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 14, 2018 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #64 Joint MOTION to Lift Stay to Allow Timely Filing of Motion for Remand of No Opposition filed by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co. (aty,Mascari, Pamela)
June 13, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #64 Joint MOTION to Lift Stay to Allow Timely Filing of Motion for Remand. Motions referred to Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 13, 2018 Filing 64 Joint MOTION to Lift Stay to Allow Timely Filing of Motion for Remand by LA Attorney General, Parish of Cameron, LA Dept of Natural Resources. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Marcello, Victor)
June 7, 2018 Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Pacific Oil Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi S A, Corporate Parent Universal Music Group Inc, Corporate Parent Vivindi Holding I LLC for Texas Pacific Oil Co Inc. (aty,Drennan, George)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Roland M Vandenweghe, Jr, Jane C Raiford, Francis V Liantonio, Jr, Gerard Joseph Gaudet, Charles A Cerise, Jr for Honeywell International Inc. Attorney Richard Dean McConnell, Jr and Richard Stuart Pabst terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/7/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 7, 2018 Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Freeport Sulphur Co identifying Corporate Parent Freeport McMoRan Inc for Freeport Sulphur Co. (aty,Mastio, Lauren)
June 7, 2018 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Exxon Mobil Corp. (aty,Rhymes, Jamie)
June 7, 2018 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Samuel Gary Jr & Associates Inc identifying Corporate Parent Gary Energy Corp for Samuel Gary Jr & Associates Inc. (aty,Capell, Brian)
June 6, 2018 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by B P America Production Co identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for B P America Production Co. (aty,Arceneaux, George)
June 6, 2018 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Taylor Energy Co L L C. (aty,Cook, Jonathan)
June 5, 2018 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vernon E Faulconer Inc. (aty,Jarrell, Charles)
June 5, 2018 Filing 55 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, Intervenor Complaint , ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, Intervenor Complaint by Vernon E Faulconer Inc.(aty,Jarrell, Charles)
June 1, 2018 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Swepi L P identifying Corporate Parent Shell Oil Co, Corporate Parent Shell Energy Holding G P L L C, Corporate Parent Shell U S E & P Investments L L C for Swepi L P. (aty,Becker, Kelly)
June 1, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co of Motion for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings Under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(aty,White, Alexandra) Modified to remove duplicate wording on 6/1/2018 (Bunting, M).
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Stay pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation as to the coordination of proceedings in this and 41 related cases. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 6/1/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 1, 2018 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shell Offshore Inc identifying Corporate Parent Shell Oil Co, Corporate Parent Shell U S E & P Investments L L C, Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell P L C, Corporate Parent S O I Finance Inc for Shell Offshore Inc. (aty,Becker, Kelly)
June 1, 2018 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shell Oil Co identifying Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell P L C for Shell Oil Co. (aty,Becker, Kelly)
June 1, 2018 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apache Corp. (aty,Longman, Douglas)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 5/31/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 31, 2018 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shell Oil Co identifying Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell P L C for Shell Oil Co. (aty,Becker, Kelly)
May 31, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #39 Answer to Complaint, sent to Douglas C Longman, Jr on behalf of Apache Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/14/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 31, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #38 MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Determination. Motions referred to Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 31, 2018 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gulfport Energy Corp. (aty,Lampton, William)
May 31, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #34 Answer to Intervenor Complaint, Answer to Complaint,sent to George Cameron Drennan on behalf of Texas Pacific Oil Co Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/14/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 31, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #33 Answer to Intervenor Complaint, Answer to Complaint, sent to George Arceneaux, III on behalf of B P America Production Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/14/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 31, 2018 Filing 42 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint with Jury Demand by Apache Corp.(aty,Longman, Douglas)
May 31, 2018 Filing 41 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, with Jury Demand by Apache Corp.(aty,Longman, Douglas)
May 31, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #27 Answer to Complaint, sent to William D Lampton on behalf of Gulfport Energy Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/14/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 31, 2018 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Apache Corp.(aty,Longman, Douglas)
May 31, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Determination by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Juneau, Claire)
May 31, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #26 Answer to Complaint, sent to Brian Wesley Capell on behalf of Samuel Gary Jr & Associates Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/14/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 31, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #19 Answer to Complaint, sent to Carl David Rosenblum on behalf of Freeport Sulphur Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/14/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 31, 2018 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corp for Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co. (aty,Shelton, Shannon)
May 30, 2018 Filing 34 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, Intervenor Complaint, ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, Intervenor Complaint, ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, Intervenor Complaint by Texas Pacific Oil Co Inc.(aty,Drennan, George)
May 30, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, Intervenor Complaint with Jury Demand, ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, Intervenor Complaint with Jury Demand, ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, Intervenor Complaint with Jury Demand by B P America Production Co.(aty,Arceneaux, George)
May 30, 2018 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Petroleum Investment Co. (aty,Guidry, Valerie)
May 30, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Petition for Damages to the Cameron Parish Coastal Zone and to Intervenors' Petitions for Intervention by Texas Petroleum Investment Co.(aty,Guidry, Valerie) Modified to create a docket entry relationship on 5/31/2018 (Bunting, M).
May 30, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Petition for Damages to the Cameron Parish Coastal Zone and to Intervenors' Petitions for Intervention by Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co.(aty,White, Alexandra) Modified to create a docket entry relationship on 5/31/2018 (Bunting, M).
May 30, 2018 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hilcorp Energy Co. (aty,Isenberg, Craig)
May 30, 2018 Filing 28 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, Intervenor Complaint with Jury Demand, ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, Intervenor Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by Hilcorp Energy Co.(aty,Isenberg, Craig)
May 30, 2018 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses to the Plaintiff's Petition and to the Intervenors' Petitions In Intervention by Gulfport Energy Corp.(aty,Lampton, William) Modified to create a docket entry relationship on 5/31/2018 (Bunting, M).
May 30, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint for Damages, and to Intervenors' Petitions for Intervention by Samuel Gary Jr & Associates Inc.(aty,Capell, Brian) Modified to add docket entry relationship on 5/31/2018 (Bunting, M). Modified docket text on 5/31/2018 (Bunting, M).
May 30, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw Richard S. Pabst, Richard D. McConnell, and Tyler Moore Kostal of the law firm of Kean Miller LLP as Attorney substitute Roland M. Vandenweghe Jr, Jane C. Raiford, Francis V. Liantonio Jr., Charles A. Cerise, Jr, and Gerard J. Gaudet of the law firm of Adams and Reese LLP, as counsel for Honeywell by Honeywell International Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Kostal, Tyler) Modified on 5/31/2018 (Bunting, M).
May 30, 2018 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Honeywell International Inc. (aty,Kostal, Tyler)
May 30, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint Honeywell International, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Petition and to the Intervenors' Petitions for Intervention by Honeywell International Inc.(aty,Kostal, Tyler) Modified to add a docket entry relationshp on 5/31/2018 (Bunting, M).
May 30, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint Shell Offshore, Inc., Shell Oil Company, and SWEPI LP's Answer to Plaintiffs' Petition for Damages and to the Intervenors' Petitions for Intervention by Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P.(aty,Becker, Kelly) Modified to add docket entry relationship on 5/31/2018 (Bunting, M).
May 30, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to the Petition in Intervention of the State of Louisiana, Through the Department of Natural Resources, Office of Coastal Management by Freeport Sulphur Co.(aty,Rosenblum, Carl) Modified to create a docket entry relationship on 5/31/2018 (Bunting, M).
May 30, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Petition for Intervention of the State of Louisiana, Ex. Rel. Jeff Landry, Attorney General by Freeport Sulphur Co.(aty,Rosenblum, Carl)
May 30, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to the Parish of Cameron's Original Petition by Freeport Sulphur Co.(aty,Rosenblum, Carl)
May 30, 2018 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss EnerVest Operating, L.L.C. by Enervest Operating L L C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Zuckerman, Adam)
May 30, 2018 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enervest Operating L L C identifying Corporate Parent EnerVest, Ltd. for Enervest Operating L L C. (aty,Zuckerman, Adam)
May 30, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint Exxon Mobil Corp.'s Answer to Petition for Damages to the Cameron Parish Coastal Zone and to Intervenors' Petitions for Intervention by Exxon Mobil Corp.(aty,McNeal, Robert)
May 30, 2018 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore L P identifying Corporate Parent Anadarko Consolidated Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Anadarko USH1 Corporation, Corporate Parent Kerr-McGee Worldwide Corporation, Corporate Parent Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Corporate Parent Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC for Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore L P. (aty,Kuchler, Deborah)
May 30, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint with Jury Demand Answer & Affirmative Defenses to the Petition in Intervention of the State of Louisiana, Through the Department of Natural Resources, Office of Coastal Management by Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore L P.(aty,DeShazo, Michele)
May 30, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, with Jury Demand Answer & Affirmative Defenses to the Petition for Intervention of the State of Louisiana, Ex Rel. Jeff Landry, Attorney General by Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore L P.(aty,DeShazo, Michele)
May 30, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer & Affirmative Defenses to the Parish of Cameron's Petition for Damages by Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore L P.(aty,DeShazo, Michele)
May 29, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER from Colin Watterson to Tony R. Moore, Clerk of US District Court, Western District of Louisiana, transmitting courtesy copy of Motion for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 USC 1407 filed with Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation, regarding Louisiana Coastal Zone Land Loss Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Defendants Motion for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit 1 - Schedule of Actions, #5 Exhibit 2 - Median Time Intervals) (crt,Reeves, T)
May 29, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by B P America Production Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co, Swepi L P, Texas Co. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, Defendants' Amended Notice of Removal. (aty,Norman, Joe)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/29/2018. (crt,Benoit, T)
May 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Parish of Cameron of letter to Judges Drell, Hicks and Doughty (aty,Marcello, Victor)
May 25, 2018 NOTICE of Corrective Action to James Blake Canfield on behalf of LA Dept of Natural Resources regarding Intervenor Complaint. Action taken: Marked "Filed in Error" docketed in wrong case. (crt,FinnSld, P)
May 24, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Robert B McNeal, Matthew A Woolf, Tyler L Weidlich, Michael P Cash, Jamie D Rhymes, Martin A Stern, Glen M Pilie', Jeffrey E Richardson, Alexandra Grace Roselli, Roy C Cheatwood, Monica A Frois on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/7/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Brett P Fenasci, Claire Elizabeth Juneau, Shannon Alicia Shelton, Charles S McCowan, III, Pamela R Mascari, Eric J Mayer, Alexandra Giselle White on behalf of Chevron Pipe Line Co, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Chevron U S A Inc, Texas Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/7/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Russell Keith Jarrett, Mark L McNamara, Dana M Douglas on behalf of Swepi L P. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/7/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Russell Keith Jarrett, Mark L McNamara, Dana M Douglas, Kelly Brechtel Becker on behalf of Shell Offshore Inc, Shell Oil Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/7/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Joe B Norman, George Arceneaux, III on behalf of BP America Production Company. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/7/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 23, 2018 FILED IN ERROR - INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by LA Dept of Natural Resources ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #57 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,FinnSld, P) Modified on 5/25/2018 to indicate filed in error as filed in wrong case (FinnSld, P).
May 23, 2018 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by LA Dept of Natural Resources. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #59 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
May 23, 2018 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by LA Attorney General.(Attorney Wilbur Lafayette Stiles, III added to party LA Attorney General(pty:intvp))(crt,Thigpen, M) ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #59 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).
May 23, 2018 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Enervest Operating L L C (Attorney Adam Bennett Zuckerman added to party Enervest Operating L L C(pty:dft)). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #58 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 23, 2018 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Gulfport Energy Corp (Attorney Gary J Russo added to party Gulfport Energy Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua A Norris added to party Gulfport Energy Corp(pty:dft), Attorney William D Lampton added to party Gulfport Energy Corp(pty:dft), Attorney William Thomas McCall, Jr added to party Gulfport Energy Corp(pty:dft)). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #58 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 23, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 38th JDC Cameron Parish, Case Number 10-19582 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3660882) filed by Shell Oil Co, Chevron Pipe Line Co, Swepi L P, BP America Production Company, Texas Co, Chevron U S A Inc, Exxon Mobil Corp, Shell Offshore Inc, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 Part 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 1 Part 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 1 Part 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 1 Part 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 2 pt1, #8 Exhibit Ex. 2 pt2, #9 Exhibit Ex. 2 pt3, #10 Exhibit Ex. 3, #11 Exhibit Ex. 4, #12 Exhibit Ex. 5, #13 Exhibit Ex. 6, #14 Exhibit Ex. 7, #15 Exhibit Ex. 8, #16 Exhibit Ex. 9, #17 Exhibit Ex. 10, #18 Exhibit Ex. 11, #19 Exhibit Ex. 12, #20 Exhibit Ex. 13, #21 Exhibit Ex. 14, #22 Exhibit Ex. 15, #23 Exhibit Ex. 16, #24 Exhibit Ex. 17, #25 Exhibit Ex. 18, #26 Exhibit Ex. 19, #27 Exhibit Ex. 20, #28 Exhibit Ex. 21, #29 Exhibit Ex. 22, #30 Exhibit Ex. 23, #31 Exhibit Ex. 24, #32 Exhibit Ex. 25, #33 Exhibit Ex. 26, #34 Exhibit Ex. 27, #35 Exhibit Ex. 28, #36 Exhibit Ex. 29, #37 Exhibit Ex. 30, #38 Exhibit Ex. 31, #39 Exhibit Ex. 32, #40 Exhibit Ex. 33, #41 Exhibit Ex. 34, #42 Exhibit Ex. 35, #43 Exhibit Ex. 36, #44 Exhibit Ex. 37, #45 Exhibit Ex. 38, #46 Exhibit Ex. 39, #47 Exhibit Ex. 40, #48 Exhibit Ex. 41, #49 Exhibit Ex. 42, #50 Exhibit Ex. 43, #51 Exhibit Ex. 44, #52 Exhibit Ex. 45, #53 Exhibit Ex. 46, #54 Exhibit Ex. 47, #55 Exhibit Ex. 48, #56 Exhibit Ex. 49, #57 Exhibit Ex. 50, #58 Exhibit Ex. 51 Consents to Removal, #59 Exhibit Ex. 52 State Court Record, #60 Civil cover sheet, #61 Civil cover sheet Attachment to Civil Cover)(Attorney Joe B Norman added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft))(aty,Norman, Joe) (Attachment 60 replaced on 5/23/2018) (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron et al v. Auster Oil & Gas Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Co
Represented By: Brett P Fenasci
Represented By: Eric J Mayer
Represented By: Shannon Alicia Shelton
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Represented By: Alexandra Giselle White
Represented By: Pamela R Mascari
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Juneau
Represented By: Charles S McCowan, III
Represented By: Peter D Keisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auster Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Energy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resource Securities Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Petroleum Investment Co
Represented By: Valerie Vige Guidry
Represented By: William H L Kaufman
Represented By: Paul J Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enervest Operating L L C
Represented By: Nancy Scott Degan
Represented By: Adam Bennett Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Corp
Represented By: Carmen M Rodriguez
Represented By: Douglas C Longman, Jr
Represented By: Boyd A Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Pipe Line Co
Represented By: Brett P Fenasci
Represented By: Eric J Mayer
Represented By: Shannon Alicia Shelton
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Represented By: Alexandra Giselle White
Represented By: Pamela R Mascari
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Juneau
Represented By: Charles S McCowan, III
Represented By: Peter D Keisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U S A Holdings Inc
Represented By: Brett P Fenasci
Represented By: Eric J Mayer
Represented By: Shannon Alicia Shelton
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Represented By: Alexandra Giselle White
Represented By: Pamela R Mascari
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Juneau
Represented By: Charles S McCowan, III
Represented By: Peter D Keisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: George Arceneaux, III
Represented By: Joe B Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore L P
Represented By: Robert Edward Guidry
Represented By: Deborah D Kuchler
Represented By: Michele Hale DeShazo
Represented By: Sarah E Iiams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon E Faulconer Inc
Represented By: Charles M Jarrell
Represented By: Gina Bradley Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corp
Represented By: Martin A Stern
Represented By: Robert B McNeal
Represented By: Jeffrey E Richardson
Represented By: Glen M Pilie'
Represented By: Jamie D Rhymes
Represented By: Alexandra Grace Roselli
Represented By: Roy C Cheatwood
Represented By: Monica A Frois
Represented By: Michael P Cash
Represented By: Tyler L Weidlich
Represented By: Matthew A Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfport Energy Corp
Represented By: William Thomas McCall, Jr
Represented By: Joshua A Norris
Represented By: Gary J Russo
Represented By: William D Lampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Co
Represented By: Mark L McNamara
Represented By: Dana M Douglas
Represented By: Kelly Brechtel Becker
Represented By: Russell Keith Jarrett
Represented By: Laura Springer Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Pacific Oil Co Inc
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Doolin
Represented By: George Cameron Drennan
Represented By: G Bruce Parkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U S A Inc
Represented By: Brett P Fenasci
Represented By: Eric J Mayer
Represented By: Shannon Alicia Shelton
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Represented By: Alexandra Giselle White
Represented By: Pamela R Mascari
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Juneau
Represented By: Charles S McCowan, III
Represented By: Peter D Keisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeport Sulphur Co
Represented By: Lauren Courtney Mastio
Represented By: Carl David Rosenblum
Represented By: Covert J Geary
Represented By: Alida C Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilcorp Energy Co
Represented By: Craig Isenberg
Represented By: David N Luder
Represented By: Christine Marie Calogero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swepi L P
Represented By: Mark L McNamara
Represented By: Dana M Douglas
Represented By: Kelly Brechtel Becker
Represented By: Russell Keith Jarrett
Represented By: Laura Springer Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Energy Co L L C
Represented By: Jonathan R Cook
Represented By: Guy Earl Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcontinental Oil Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Offshore Inc
Represented By: Mark L McNamara
Represented By: Dana M Douglas
Represented By: Kelly Brechtel Becker
Represented By: Russell Keith Jarrett
Represented By: Laura Springer Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Gary Jr & Associates Inc
Represented By: Brian Wesley Capell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Represented By: Francis V Liantonio, Jr
Represented By: Richard Dean McConnell, Jr
Represented By: Jane C Raiford
Represented By: Roland M Vandenweghe, Jr
Represented By: Gerard Joseph Gaudet
Represented By: Richard Stuart Pabst
Represented By: Tyler Ann Kostal
Represented By: Charles A Cerise, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darsey Operating Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B P America Production Co
Represented By: George Arceneaux, III
Represented By: Joe B Norman
Represented By: Emily Claire Borgen
Represented By: Matthew T Heartney
Represented By: Nancy G Milburn
Represented By: Brian Wesley Capell
Represented By: Tiffany Delery Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: LA Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: LA Dept of Natural Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Wilbur Lafayette Stiles, III
Represented By: Steven B Jones
Represented By: Donald W Price
Represented By: James Blake Canfield
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Terrell
Represented By: Ryan Michael Seidemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parish of Cameron
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Leah Cotten Poole
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Keating
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Wesley Alan Romero
Represented By: Christopher D Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?