Boudreaux v. Axiall Corp et al
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Boudreaux and Shirley A Boudreaux
Defendant: Gerogia Gulf Lake Charles L L C, Axiall Corp, Georgia Gulf Corp, Levingston Group L L C, Turner Industries Group L L C, Vector Electric & Controls Inc, Sun L L C and Georgia Gulf Lake Charles L L C
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Eagle U S 2 L L C
3Rd Party Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co, Gilbane Inc, Parsons Government Services Inc, Lexington Insurance Co, Granite State Insurance Co, Gilbane Building Co and National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA
Case Number: 2:2018cv00956
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Referring Judge: James T Trimble
2 Judge: Donald E Walter
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/17/2018. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
September 12, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Reasor, M)
September 11, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand , In the Alternative, MOTION to Sever filed by Axiall Corp, Eagle U S 2 L L C, Georgia Gulf Corp, Georgia Gulf Lake Charles L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Leitzelar, Luis) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
September 11, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Remand and, in the alternative, MOTION to Sever by Granite State Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Johnson, Mary) Modified on 9/12/2018 to add document relation and edit text (FinnSld, P).
September 11, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: #13 MOTION to Remand by Gilbane Building Co, Gilbane Inc, Parsons Government Services Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Groves, Leigh) Modified on 9/11/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
September 11, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Motions referred to Judge Donald E Walter. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 7, 2018 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gilbane Building Co, Gilbane Inc, Parsons Government Services Inc. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-6 - Citation, Motion and Exhibits for Parsons, #2 Exhibit A-7 - Citation, Motion and Exhibigts for Gilbane Building Co, #3 Exhibit A-8 - Citation, Motion and Exhibits for Gilbane Inc)(crt,FinnSld, P)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #19 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Notice of Removal. Based on representations made by counsel in communication linked hereto that plaintiff has no objection, the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/7/2018. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #19 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Notice of Removal filed by Gilbane Inc, Gilbane Building Co, Parsons Government Services Inc. Any party who opposes this motion should file a formal opposition on or before close of business on 9/14/2018. Should no formal objection be filed then the motion will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/7/2018. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
September 6, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Notice of Removal with consent sought but not yet obtained by Gilbane Building Co, Gilbane Inc, Parsons Government Services Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading Ex A - Supplemental Notice of Removal, #2 Proposed Ex A-6 - Citation, Motion and Exhibits for Parsons, #3 Proposed Ex A-7 - Citation, Motion and Exhibits for Gilbane Building Company, #4 Proposed Ex A-8 Citation, Motion and Exhibits for Gilbane, Inc., #5 Rule 7.6 Certificate, #6 Proposed order)(aty,Groves, Leigh) Modified on 9/6/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re Petition attached to #1 Notice of Removal. Gilbane Building Co answer due 9/26/2018; Gilbane Inc answer due 9/26/2018; Parsons Government Services Inc answer due 9/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/28/2018. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
August 23, 2018 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Axiall Corp, Eagle U S 2 L L C, Gerogia Gulf Lake Charles L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #17 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER)(Attorney William B Monk added to party Axiall Corp, Eagle U S 2 L L C(pty:dft), and Georgia Gulf Lake Charles L L C(pty:dft))(crt,FinnSld, P)
August 23, 2018 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Turner Industries Group L L C.(Attorney Ernest P Gieger, Jr, John E W Baay, II and Michael D Cangelosi added to party Turner Industries Group L L C(pty:dft)) ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #17 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER)(crt,FinnSld, P)
August 23, 2018 ANSWER to COMPLAINT, Amended Complaint and Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sun L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #17 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER (Attorney Eric W Roan added to party Sun L L C(pty:dft))(crt,FinnSld, P)
August 23, 2018 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Georgia Gulf Corp answer due 7/27/2018; Levingston Group L L C answer due 7/27/2018; Vector Electric & Controls Inc answer due 7/27/2018. (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #17 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER (crt,FinnSld, P) Modified on 8/24/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
August 23, 2018 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand by Axiall Corp. (crt,FinnSld, P)(PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #5 OF DOCUMENT 17 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER) Modified on 8/24/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
August 23, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Gilbane Building Co, Gilbane Inc, Parsons Government Services Inc . (Attachments: #1 State court notice of filing Certification, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit A-1 State Court Record, #4 Exhibit A-2 State Court Record, #5 Exhibit A-3 State Court Record, #6 Exhibit A-4 State Court Record, #7 Exhibit B - State Court Record after Certification from 14th JDC, #8 Exhibit C - State Court Record Index)(aty,Groves, Leigh)
August 22, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal with consent to Eagel US 2 LLC's Third Party Demand by Gilbane Building Co, Gilbane Inc, Parsons Government Services Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 7.9 Certificate, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Groves, Leigh)
August 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #13 MOTION to Remand And, In the Alternative MOTION to Sever . Motions referred to Judge Donald E Walter. Motion day set for 10/5/2018 before Judge Donald E Walter. (crt,FinnSld, P) Modified on 8/21/2018 to edit text and regenerate nef (FinnSld, P).
August 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Remand And, In the Alternative MOTION to Sever . Motion day set for 10/5/2018 before Judge Donald E Walter. (crt,FinnSld, P)
August 17, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #13 MOTION to Remand And, In the Alternative MOTION to Sever, #14 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #13 MOTION to Remand And, In the Alternative MOTION to Sever. Motions referred to Judge Donald E Walter. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 16, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #13 MOTION to Remand And, In the Alternative MOTION to Sever by Robert Lee Boudreaux, Shirley A Boudreaux. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed order)(aty,Palermo, J)
August 16, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand And, In the Alternative, MOTION to Sever by Robert Lee Boudreaux, Shirley A Boudreaux. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed order)(aty,Palermo, J)
August 9, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Granite State Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA indicating Corporate Parent A I G Property Casualty U S Inc, Other affiliates are A I G Property Casualty Inc and American International Group Inc (aty,Johnson, Mary) Modified on 8/9/2018 to add corporate parent and other affiliates (FinnSld, P).
August 7, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk and by order of Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge Donald E Walter. Judge James T Trimble, Jr no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Whidden, C)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Granite State Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA answer due no later than 30 days after ruling on any motion to remand or if no motion is filed, until 9/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/26/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Gilbane Building Co answer due 8/27/2018; Gilbane Inc answer due 8/27/2018; Parsons Government Services Inc answer due 8/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/26/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
July 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer,, sent to Mary S Johnson on behalf of Granite State Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. 3pd. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/9/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent (of Counsel for Eagle) by Granite State Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. 3pd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Johnson, Mary) Modified on 7/26/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
July 25, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gilbane Building Co, Gilbane Inc, Parsons Government Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent Gilbane Inc for Gilbane Building Co; Corporate Parent Parsons Corporation for Parsons Government Services Inc. (aty,Groves, Leigh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint, with consent by Gilbane Building Co, Gilbane Inc, Parsons Government Services Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 7.9 Certificate, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Groves, Leigh)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/24/2018. (crt,LaCombe, L)
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Keely Y Scott, Autumn Marie Coe, Leigh F Groves on behalf of Gilbane Building Co, Gilbane Inc, Parsons Government Services Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/6/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 20, 2018 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL & AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gerogia Gulf Lake Charles L L C, Levingston Group L L C, Sun L L C, Turner Industries Group L L C, Vector Electric & Controls Inc filed by Shirley A Boudreaux, Robert Lee Boudreaux. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(crt,Thigpen, M)
July 20, 2018 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL & AMENDING COMPLAINT against Gerogia Gulf Lake Charles L L C, Levingston Group L L C, Sun L L C, Turner Industries Group L L C, Vector Electric & Controls Inc filed by Shirley A Boudreaux, Robert Lee Boudreaux. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(crt,Thigpen, M)
July 20, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge James T Trimble, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 20, 2018 ANSWER to Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Gilbane Building Co, Gilbane Inc, Granite State Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, National Union Fire Insurance Co, Parsons Government Services Inc by Eagle U S 2 L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2014-2032 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3706873) filed by Gilbane Building Company, Parsons Government Services Inc, Gilbane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition of Damages, #2 Exhibit 2 - Eagle's Supp Answer & 3rd Pty Demand, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Logan Hollobaugh, #4 Exhibit 3-a Contract for Construction Manager, #5 Exhibit 3-b Dept of Energy Letter, #6 Exhibit 3-c Dept of Energy Letter, Schedule, #7 Exhibit 3-d Part 1 of 2 - Contract, #8 Exhibit 3-d Part 2 of 2 - Contract, #9 Exhibit 4 - Joint Venture Agreement, #10 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Marshal R. Lightman, #11 Civil cover sheet, #12 Exhibit Certificate of Filing of State Pleadings, #13 Exhibit List of Attorneys and Parties in the State Court Action, #14 State court notice of filing)(Attorney Leigh F Groves added to party Gilbane Building Company(pty:3pd), Attorney Leigh F Groves added to party Gilbane, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Leigh F Groves added to party Parsons Government Services Inc(pty:3pd))(aty,Groves, Leigh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boudreaux v. Axiall Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerogia Gulf Lake Charles L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axiall Corp
Represented By: William B Monk
Represented By: Michael A Chernekoff
Represented By: F Charles Marionneaux
Represented By: Michael Ryan Rhea
Represented By: Stephen Donald Polito
Represented By: Luis A Leitzelar
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Gulf Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levingston Group L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Industries Group L L C
Represented By: John E W Baay, II
Represented By: Ernest P Gieger, Jr
Represented By: Michael D Cangelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vector Electric & Controls Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun L L C
Represented By: Eric W Roan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Gulf Lake Charles L L C
Represented By: William B Monk
Represented By: Michael A Chernekoff
Represented By: F Charles Marionneaux
Represented By: Michael Ryan Rhea
Represented By: Stephen Donald Polito
Represented By: Luis A Leitzelar
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Eagle U S 2 L L C
Represented By: William B Monk
Represented By: Michael A Chernekoff
Represented By: F Charles Marionneaux
Represented By: Michael Ryan Rhea
Represented By: Stephen Donald Polito
Represented By: Luis A Leitzelar
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Gilbane Inc
Represented By: Leigh F Groves
Represented By: Autumn Marie Coe
Represented By: Keely Y Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Parsons Government Services Inc
Represented By: Leigh F Groves
Represented By: Autumn Marie Coe
Represented By: Keely Y Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Lexington Insurance Co
Represented By: Mary S Johnson
Represented By: Nichole Mart Gray
Represented By: Sarah Suzanne W Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Granite State Insurance Co
Represented By: Mary S Johnson
Represented By: Nichole Mart Gray
Represented By: Sarah Suzanne W Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Gilbane Building Co
Represented By: Leigh F Groves
Represented By: Autumn Marie Coe
Represented By: Keely Y Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: Mary S Johnson
Represented By: Nichole Mart Gray
Represented By: Sarah Suzanne W Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Boudreaux
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Represented By: J Michael Veron
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Eulis Simien, Jr
Represented By: J Rock Palermo, III
Represented By: Alonzo P Wilson
Represented By: Jamie B Bice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley A Boudreaux
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Represented By: J Michael Veron
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Eulis Simien, Jr
Represented By: J Rock Palermo, III
Represented By: Alonzo P Wilson
Represented By: Jamie B Bice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?