Patel v. Sessions et al

Plaintiff: Sanjaykumar G Patel
Defendant: Kirstjen M Nielsen, Mike Manuel, David D Rivera and Jeff Sessions
Respondent: Attorney General Jeff Sessions, Secretary Kirstjen M Nielsen, Warden Mike Manuel and Director David D Rivera
Case Number: 2:2018cv01325
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney General. Served on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney served on 10/18/2018, answer due 12/18/2018; Warden Allen Parish Public Safety Complex served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to David D Rivera served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018.(crt,Haik, K)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mike Manuel, Kirstjen M Nielsen, David D Rivera, Jeff Sessions, U S Attorney and U S Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Certified mail receipts)(crt,Haik, K)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to issue summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/11/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice without designation of local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/11/2018. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
October 9, 2018 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Scott E. Bratton to Appear Pro Hac Vice without designation of local counsel ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3775040) by Sanjaykumar G Patel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Bratton, Scott)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 0536-3775023) filed by Sanjaykumar G Patel. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Order to Show Cause 1994, #3 Exhibit B-Immigration Judge's decision, #4 Exhibit C-I-246 Stay of Deportation Denial, #5 Exhibit D-Decision to Continue Detention, #6 Proposed summons/writ for Jeff Sessions, #7 Proposed summons/writ for Kirstjen Nielson, #8 Proposed summons/writ for David D. Rivera, #9 Proposed summons/writ for Mike Manuel)(Attorney Scott Eric Bratton added to party Sanjaykumar G Patel(pty:pet))(aty,Bratton, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Kirstjen M Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Mike Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director David D Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanjaykumar G Patel
Represented By: Scott Eric Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David D Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?