Doucet v. Calcasieu Parish
Plaintiff: Danny J Doucet
Defendant: Police Jury of Calcasieu Parish
Case Number: 2:2018cv01580
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 JUDGMENT granting #8 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/26/2018. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Danny J Doucet. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Review of plaintiff's financial information indicates clearly he is not entitled to pauperis status. Accordingly his request is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/12/2018. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. There is no right to the automatic appointment of counsel in a civil case, even where the litigant has been granted permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Branch v. Cole, 686 F.2d 264, 266 (5th Cir. 1982); Salmon v. Corpus Christi ISD, 911 F.2d 1165, 166 (5th Cir. 1990). "In evaluating whether the appointment of counsel is proper, the district court considers the type and complexity of the case, the litigant's ability to investigate and present the case, and the level of skill required to present the evidence." Castro Romero v. Becken, 256 F.3d 349, 354 (5th Cir. 2001). The court has "considerable discretion" in determining whether appointment of counsel is warranted. Salmon, 911 F.3d at 1166. Here plaintiff presents no basis for appointment of counsel other than his pending application to proceed in forma pauperis, and even declares that he has made no effort to find counsel on his own. Accordingly, the court finds no basis for appointing counsel in this matter and the motion is DENIED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/12/2018. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER re #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 4, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Danny J Doucet. (crt,Benoit, T)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Danny J Doucet. (crt,Benoit, T)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Police Jury of Calcasieu Parish filed by Danny J Doucet. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(crt,Benoit, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doucet v. Calcasieu Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Jury of Calcasieu Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny J Doucet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?