Trejo et al v. Waddington et al

Plaintiff: Shannon Jaime and Robin Trejo
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Co, State Farm Automobile Insurance Co (U M), Richard Waddington and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2018cv01585
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER, entitled List of Parties, by Auto Owners Insurance Co, Richard Waddington (aty,Schoen, Hunter) Modified to edit docket text on 1/15/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Automobile Insurance Co.(aty,Bolinger, Jackson) Modified to correct filer on 1/9/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (aty,Bolinger, Jackson) Modified to correct filer on 12/28/2018 (ThomasSld, T).
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Auto Owners Insurance Co. (aty,Schoen, Hunter) Modified to edit filers on 12/26/2018 (ThomasSld, T).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/17/2018. (crt,LaCombe, L)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Auto Owners Insurance Co, Richard Waddington.(aty,Schoen, Hunter)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Christopher A D'Amour, Hunter Jacob Schoen on behalf of Auto Owners Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/21/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 6, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 6, 2018 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Auto Owners Insurance Co answer due 12/13/2018. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 6, 2018 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by State Farm Automobile Insurance Co (U M) (Attorney Jackson B Bolinger added to party State Farm Automobile Insurance Co (U M)(pty:dft)). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #4 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 33rd JDC Allen Parish, Case Number 2018-463 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3823485) filed by Auto Owners Insurance Co, Richard Waddington. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit State Farm Consent Form)(Attorney Hunter Jacob Schoen added to party Auto Owners Insurance Co(pty:selreq), Attorney Hunter Jacob Schoen added to party Richard Waddington(pty:selreq))(aty,Schoen, Hunter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/7/2018) (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trejo et al v. Waddington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Co
Represented By: Hunter Jacob Schoen
Represented By: Christopher A D'Amour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Co (U M)
Represented By: Jackson B Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Waddington
Represented By: Hunter Jacob Schoen
Represented By: Christopher A D'Amour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Represented By: Jackson B Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Jaime
Represented By: Cullen Ryan Clement
Represented By: Joseph Charles Possa
Represented By: Stephanie Michele Possa
Represented By: Lidia A Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Trejo
Represented By: Cullen Ryan Clement
Represented By: Joseph Charles Possa
Represented By: Stephanie Michele Possa
Represented By: Lidia A Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?