Louisiana Independent Pharmacies Association v. Express Scripts Inc
Plaintiff: Louisiana Independent Pharmacies Association
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00450
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Louisiana Independent Pharmacies Association (aty,Whaley, John)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Louisiana Independent Pharmacies Association. (aty,Whaley, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by John R Whaley (aty,Whaley, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to John R Whaley on behalf of Louisiana Independent Pharmacies Association. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/25/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Express Scripts Inc (crt,Crick, S)
April 9, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Express Scripts Inc (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3921057) filed by Louisiana Independent Pharmacies Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John R Whaley added to party Louisiana Independent Pharmacies Association (pty:pla))(aty,Whaley, John) Modified on 4/10/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Independent Pharmacies Association v. Express Scripts Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Independent Pharmacies Association
Represented By: John R Whaley
Represented By: Benjamin H Dampf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?