USA v. Richard
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Richard R Richard
Case Number: 2:2019cv00515
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 15:631
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Richard R Richard. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION/REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Richard R. Richard by USA. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (aty,Waterston, Tass)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Richard R Richard waiver sent on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (aty,Waterston, Tass)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard R Richard. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
April 23, 2019 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard R Richard (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Indebtedness, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Tass Dever Waterston added to party USA(pty:pla))(aty,Waterston, Tass) (Attachment 2 modified to nonfillable form replaced on 4/23/2019) (ThomasSld, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard R Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tass Dever Waterston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?