Vereen v. Beacon C M P Corp et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Vereen
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, Cyprus Amax Minerals Co, F M A S L L C, F Miller & Sons Inc, Brenntag Specialties Inc, Colgate Palmolive Co, P P G Industries Inc, Mineral & Pigment Solutions Inc, Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc, Market Basket Stores, Imerys Talc America Inc, Brenntag North America Inc, Beacon C M P Corp and Olin Corp
Case Number: 2:2019cv00531
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Case A Dam terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/25/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand and Abstention filed by Lisa Vereen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 15, #7 Exhibit 16, #8 Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit 18, #10 Exhibit 19, #11 Exhibit 20, #12 Exhibit 21, #13 Exhibit 22, #14 Exhibit 23, #15 Exhibit 24)(aty,Gaughan, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand and Abstention filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- EDPA Court Decision, #2 Exhibit 2 -- EDNY Court Decision (Mustapick), #3 Exhibit 3 -- EDNY Court Decision (Gavin), #4 Exhibit 4 -- ND Ohio Court Decision (Berry), #5 Exhibit 5 -- ND Ohio Court Decision (Reardon), #6 Exhibit 6 -- D Mass Court Decision)(aty,Sossamon, Meera)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc and Notice of Compliance with 28 USC 2447(b). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- State Court Record, part 1, #2 Exhibit A -- State Court Record, part 2, #3 Exhibit A -- State Court Record, part 3, #4 Exhibit A -- State Court Record, part 4)(aty,Sossamon, Meera)
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Lisa Vereen of Recent Court Decisions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit List of Remands)(aty,Gaughan, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE re #17 MOTION to Withdraw Case A. Dam as Attorney by Jeffrey T Gaughan on behalf of Lisa Vereen, indicating Consent (aty,Gaughan, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw Case A. Dam as Attorney by Lisa Vereen. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Gaughan, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/6/2019 to modify docket text and indicate #18 Certificate of Consent submitted as separate document. (Crick, S).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Sam E Taylor, II for Lisa Vereen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/30/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Kevin Parker for Lisa Vereen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/30/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Sam Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3959649) by Lisa Vereen. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(aty,Gaughan, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Kevin Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3959630) by Lisa Vereen. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(aty,Gaughan, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Sam Taylor to Enroll as Counsel Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Vereen. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order order, #2 Certificate of good standing certificate of good standing)(aty,Gaughan, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/29/2019 to indicate filed in error and refiled as Document #14 (JonesSld, P).
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Kevin Parker to Enroll as Counsel Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Vereen. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order order, #2 Certificate of good standing certificate of good standing)(aty,Gaughan, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/29/2019 to indicate filed in error and refiled as Document #13 (JonesSld, P).
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 MOTION to Remand and Abstention. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,JonesSld, P)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand and Abstention by Lisa Vereen. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 MD Anderson pathology report, #4 Deposition of Lisa Vereen, #5 Original Petition, #6 List of J&J Remand orders, #7 Available J&J Remand orders, #8 J&J Responses to RFA, #9 Imery's Indemnity Demand, #10 Communication with Defense counsel, #11 Discovery Responses)(aty,Gaughan, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/23/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Lisa Vereen of Rule 9027 (aty,Gaughan, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (aty,Sossamon, Meera)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/9/2019. (crt,LaCombe, L)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint, ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(aty,Benach, Carlos) Modified on 5/3/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Recent Court Decision by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc (Attachments: #1 Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(aty,Sossamon, Meera) Modified on 5/2/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Leila Anne D'Aquin, Carlos Andre Benach, Kim E Moore, Claire Adams Noonan, John W Sinnott, Meera Unnithan Sossamon on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/14/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 26, 2019 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 26, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint, First Supplemenal Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
April 26, 2019 THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL &AMENDED COMPLAINT against Beacon C M P Corp, Brenntag North America Inc, Brenntag Specialties Inc, Colgate Palmolive Co, Cyprus Amax Minerals Co, F M A S L L C, F Miller & Sons Inc, Imerys Talc America Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, Market Basket Stores, Mineral & Pigment Solutions Inc, Olin Corp, P P G Industries Inc filed by Lisa Vereen. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 26, 2019 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL & AMENDED COMPLAINT against Beacon C M P Corp, Brenntag North America Inc, Brenntag Specialties Inc, Colgate Palmolive Co, Cyprus Amax Minerals Co, F M A S L L C, F Miller & Sons Inc, Imerys Talc America Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, Market Basket Stores, Mineral & Pigment Solutions Inc, Olin Corp, P P G Industries Inc, Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc filed by Lisa Vereen. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).
April 26, 2019 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL & AMENDED COMPLAINT against Beacon C M P Corp, Brenntag North America Inc, Brenntag Specialties Inc, Colgate Palmolive Co, Cyprus Amax Minerals Co, Imerys Talc America Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, Market Basket Stores, Mineral & Pigment Solutions Inc, Olin Corp, P P G Industries Inc, Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc filed by Lisa Vereen. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2017-4371 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3934374) filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Part 1 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #3 Exhibit B - Part 2 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #4 Exhibit B - Part 3 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #5 Exhibit B - Part 4 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #6 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Claire Adams Noonan added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Claire Adams Noonan added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Noonan, Claire)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vereen v. Beacon C M P Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Kim E Moore
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Leila Anne D'Aquin
Represented By: John W Sinnott
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Kim E Moore
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Leila Anne D'Aquin
Represented By: John W Sinnott
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F M A S L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Miller & Sons Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate Palmolive Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P P G Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral & Pigment Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Market Basket Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon C M P Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olin Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Vereen
Represented By: William B Baggett, Jr
Represented By: Kevin Parker
Represented By: Case A Dam
Represented By: W Mark Lanier
Represented By: Sam E Taylor, II
Represented By: Jeffrey T Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?