Pentacost et al v. American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida et al

Plaintiff: Charlotte Pentacost, Joe Pentacost Jr. and Joseph Pentacost, Jr
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, HomeFirst Agency Inc and American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida
Not Yet Classified: HomeFirst Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00592
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Removal Order by American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(aty,Serou, Gordon) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correctly identify document (Dauterive, C).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/21/2019. (crt,LaCombe, L)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida identifying Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc. for American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida. (aty,Serou, Gordon)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HomeFirst Agency Inc identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for HomeFirst Agency Inc. (aty,Serou, Gordon)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #3 Consent to Removal, #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Gordon P Serou, Jr on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida, HomeFirst Agency Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/23/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
May 8, 2019 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Mitchell, P)
May 8, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida, HomeFirst Agency Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #2 , Notice of Compliance.(crt,Mitchell, P)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by HomeFirst Agency, Inc. (Attorney Gordon P Serou, Jr added to party HomeFirst Agency, Inc.(pty:selreq)). (aty,Serou, Gordon)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida re #1 Notice of Removal,,, of Compliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- state court Answer)(aty,Serou, Gordon)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2018-5328 B (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3944125) filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Policy of Insurance, #3 Exhibit C - Explanation of Benefits Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit D - 1 - Plaintiffs' receipts, #6 Exhibit D - 2 - Plaintiffs' receipts, #7 Exhibit E - Plaintiffs' responses to Requests for Admission, #8 Exhibit F - Consent to Removal HomeFirst Agency, Inc., #9 Exhibit G - process as served on HomeFirst Agency, Inc., #10 Exhibit H - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #11 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Gordon P Serou, Jr added to party American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida(pty:dft))(aty,Serou, Gordon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pentacost et al v. American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By: Gordon P Serou, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeFirst Agency Inc
Represented By: Gordon P Serou, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida
Represented By: Gordon P Serou, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Pentacost
Represented By: Deil J Lalande
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Jeanette Elizabeth DeWitt-Kyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Pentacost Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pentacost, Jr
Represented By: Deil J Lalande
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Jeanette Elizabeth DeWitt-Kyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HomeFirst Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Gordon P Serou, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?