VanDyke v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Peggy L VanDyke
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00710
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER: This matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Unassigned District Judge are hereby reset before Judge Cain. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr.(crt,Whidden, C)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/7/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,Crick, S)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/6/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 4, 2019 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peggy L VanDyke. (crt,Benoit, T)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner Social Security Administration filed by Peggy L VanDyke. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(crt,Benoit, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VanDyke v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy L VanDyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?