Briscoe v. City of Lake Charles et al
Plaintiff: Asia Briscoe
Defendant: City of Lake Charles, X Y Z Insurance Co, Police Dept City of Lake Charles, Shawn Caldwell and Jonathan Landrum
Case Number: 2:2019cv00827
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT granting #7 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss with prejudice with plaintiff to bear all costs of court. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 8/7/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Submitted on Behalf of Asia Briscoe as Natural Tutrix of the Minor, Jon'tavious Lamar Briscoe, by Shawn Caldwell, City of Lake Charles, Police Dept City of Lake Charles, Jonathan Landrum, X Y Z Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order submitted on behalf of Plaintiff, Asia Briscoe as the Natural Tutrix of the Minor, Jon'tavious Lamar Briscoe)(Attorney David L Morgan added to party City of Lake Charles(pty:dft))(aty,Morgan, David)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petition attached to #1 Notice of Removal. Shawn Caldwell answer due 9/3/2019; City of Lake Charles answer due 9/3/2019; Police Dept City of Lake Charles answer due 9/3/2019; Jonathan Landrum answer due 9/3/2019; X Y Z Insurance Co answer due 9/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/11/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/11/2019. (crt,LaCombe, L)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER: This matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Unassigned District Judge are hereby reset before Judge Cain. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr.(crt,Whidden, C)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Shawn Caldwell, City of Lake Charles, Police Dept City of Lake Charles, Jonathan Landrum, X Y Z Insurance Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Conference, #2 Proposed order)(aty,John, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 26, 2019 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 26, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Shawn Caldwell, City of Lake Charles, Lake Charles Police Dept, Jonathan Landrum answer due 7/3/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #7 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2019-2446 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3983786) filed by XYZ Insurance Company, City of Lake Charles, Shawn Caldwell, Lake Charles Police Dept, Jonathan Landrum. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 State court petition Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 State court citation Exhibits 3-6, #7 State court return of service Exhibits 7-10)(Attorney Christopher E John added to party Shawn Caldwell(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher E John added to party City of Lake Charles(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher E John added to party Lake Charles Police Dept(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher E John added to party Jonathan Landrum(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher E John added to party XYZ Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,John, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briscoe v. City of Lake Charles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lake Charles
Represented By: Christopher E John
Represented By: David L Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Represented By: David L Morgan
Represented By: Christopher E John
Represented By: Marion G Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Dept City of Lake Charles
Represented By: David L Morgan
Represented By: Christopher E John
Represented By: Marion G Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Caldwell
Represented By: David L Morgan
Represented By: Christopher E John
Represented By: Marion G Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Landrum
Represented By: David L Morgan
Represented By: Christopher E John
Represented By: Marion G Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asia Briscoe
Represented By: Wilford D Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?