USA v. Jack Wayte Construction Co Inc et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Jack Wayte Construction Co., Inc., CMS Corporation, Lexon Insurance Company, JWC CMS JV, Ironshore Indemnity, Inc., Bond Safeguard Insurance Company, Ironshore Indemnity Inc, C M S Corp, J W C C M S J V, Bond Safeguard Insurance Co, Jack Wayte Construction Co Inc and Lexon Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv00916
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by USA (aty,Norman, Merrick)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bond Safeguard Insurance Co, C M S Corp, Ironshore Indemnity Inc, J W C C M S J V, Jack Wayte Construction Co Inc, Lexon Insurance Co filed by USA.(aty,Norman, Merrick) Modified on 7/22/2019 edit text(JonesSld, P).
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bond Safeguard Insurance Co, C M S Corp, Ironshore Indemnity Inc, J W C C M S J V, Jack Wayte Construction Co Inc, Lexon Insurance Co (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by USA. (aty,Norman, Merrick)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bond Safeguard Insurance Co, C M S Corp, Ironshore Indemnity Inc, J W C C M S J V, Jack Wayte Construction Co Inc, Lexon Insurance Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3998606) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Attorney Merrick J Norman, Jr added to party USA(pty:pla))(aty,Norman, Merrick) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/17/2019 to correct orientation) (JonesSld, P). Modified on 7/17/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Jack Wayte Construction Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Merrick J Norman, Jr
Represented By: Judson Merrick Norman
Represented By: Joseph Palmer Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Wayte Construction Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JWC CMS JV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Indemnity, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bond Safeguard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Indemnity Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C M S Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J W C C M S J V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bond Safeguard Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Wayte Construction Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?