Maine v. The Boeing Co
Plaintiff: Scott Thomas Maine
Defendant: Boeing Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv00930
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Boeing Co.(aty,Frohn, David)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Petition for Damages. Boeing Co answer due 8/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/26/2019. (crt,Benoit, T)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Damages by Boeing Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Local Rule 7.9 Certificate, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Frohn, David) Modified on 7/25/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/22/2019. (crt,LaCombe, L)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Certification of State Court Record by Boeing Co re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Frohn, David) Modified on 7/22/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Certification of Counsel by Boeing Co re #1 Notice of Removal (aty,Frohn, David) Modified on 7/22/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiffs by Boeing Co re #1 Notice of Removal (aty,Frohn, David) Modified on 7/22/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT NOTICE of Removal by Boeing Co of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court re #1 Notice of Removal, (aty,Frohn, David) Modified on 7/22/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 19, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 19, 2019 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boeing Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 19, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Boeing Co answer due 7/26/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2019-2589 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4001545) filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil cover sheet, #3 Exhibit Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure)(Attorney David R Frohn added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft))(aty,Frohn, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maine v. The Boeing Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Co
Represented By: Helen Meredith Buckley
Represented By: Glenn L M Swetman
Represented By: David R Frohn
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Thomas Maine
Represented By: Oliver Schrumpf
Represented By: Charles Schrumpf
Represented By: Stacy Diane Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?