Johnson v. Lake Charles Memorial Hospital
Plaintiff: Denise Johnson
Defendant: Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association d/b/a Lake Charles Memorial Health System, Lake Charles Memorial Hospital and Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv00941
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT granting #7 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, with all applicable costs of court to be paid by defendant, Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association, d/b/a Lake Charles Memorial Health System. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 9/19/2019. (crt,Benoit, T)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss by Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association, Denis Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Morgan, David) Modified on 9/18/2019 to modify docket text and add filer. (Crick, S).
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association identifying Corporate Parent, Southwest Louisiana Healthcare Systems Inc for Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association. (Attorney David L Morgan added to party Lake Charles Memorial Hospital(pty:dft)). (aty,Morgan, David) Modified on 7/24/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/24/2019. (crt,LaCombe, L)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Kevin Paul Fontenot, David L Morgan on behalf of Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/6/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 22, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association d/b/a Lake Charles Memorial Health System.(aty,Morgan, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2019-001260 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4004069) filed by Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association d/b/a Lake Charles Memorial Health System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Civil cover sheet, #4 Verification and Certificate of Notice of Removal)(Attorney David L Morgan added to party Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association d/b/a Lake Charles Memorial Health System(pty:dft))(aty,Morgan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Lake Charles Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association d/b/a Lake Charles Memorial Health System
Represented By: David L Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Charles Memorial Hospital
Represented By: David L Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association
Represented By: Kevin Paul Fontenot
Represented By: David L Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?