Okeayainneh v. McHenry et al
Plaintiff: Julian Okeayainneh
Defendant: William Barr, James McHenry and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 2:2019cv01024
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Julian Okeayainneh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(crt,Haik, K)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/10/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
September 6, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Julian Okeayainneh in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635062349. (crt,Walker, B)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Julian Okeayainneh. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed exhibits, #3 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 9/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 2241 form, #2 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/27/2019) (Haik, K).
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 7, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Julian Okeayainneh. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A). Complaint not on approved forms.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okeayainneh v. McHenry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Okeayainneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?