Williams v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: Gary Williams
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc, X Y Z Insurance Co and Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Case Number: 2:2019cv01048
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C.(aty,Fontenot, Philip)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C . (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(aty,Fontenot, Philip)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/8/2019. (crt,LaCombe, L)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anne Elise Brodsky terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/25/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw Anne Elise Brodsky as Attorney for Defendant, Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Fontenot, Philip)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East L P, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East Inc, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Texas L P, Other Affiliate Walmart Inc, Other Affiliate WSE Management, L L C, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, L L C, Wal-Mart de Mexico, S A de C V, Seiyu Ltd for Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (aty,Fontenot, Philip) Modified on 8/15/2019 to add other affiliates (JonesSld, P).
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Jami Lacour Ishee, Anne Elise Brodsky, Philip Andre' Fontenot on behalf of Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/27/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 13, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 13, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Wal-Mart Stores Inc answer due 8/20/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 30th JDC Vernon Parish, Case Number 97689 "A" with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4022347) filed by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 State court petition, #3 State court return of service, #4 Exhibit B-Medical Records, #5 State Court Notice of Removal, #6 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Philip Andre' Fontenot added to party Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Fontenot, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Williams
Represented By: H Dean Lucius, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Philip Andre' Fontenot
Represented By: Jami Lacour Ishee
Represented By: Anne Elise Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?