Ortiz v. Cajun Industries L L C
Plaintiff: Eddie Ortiz
Defendant: Cajun Industries, LLC and Cajun Industries L L C
Case Number: 2:2019cv01089
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eddie Ortiz. Cajun Industries L L C waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (aty,Sudduth, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cajun Industries L L C (crt,Bunting, M)
August 19, 2019 Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cajun Industries L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4027810) filed by Eddie Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James Edward Sudduth, III added to party Eddie Ortiz(pty:pla))(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified docket text on 8/20/2019 (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Cajun Industries L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cajun Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cajun Industries L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Ortiz
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Pierce Alexander Rapin
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?