Howard v. Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc
Plaintiff: Harrell Howard
Defendant: Fleetwood Transportation Services, Inc. and Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01155
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Fleetwood Carriers Inc by Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc. (aty,Seneca, Van) Modified to add Corporate Parent on 10/23/2019 (Thomas, T).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Warren Thomas McCollum for Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/18/2019. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 17, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #14 MOTION for Warren McCollum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Warren McCollum to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Seneca, Van) Modified to correct event type and edit docket text on 10/17/2019. Fee previously paid see document #11 (Thomas, T).
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency to Van Clifton Seneca on behalf of Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc regarding #11 MOTION for Warren McCollum to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4076520). Reason: The above item requires a certificate of good standing. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc re #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (aty,Seneca, Van)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 DEFICIENT MOTION for Warren McCollum to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4076520) by Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (aty,Seneca, Van) Modified to reflect deficient status on 10/16/2019 (Thomas, T). Modified to indicate document corrected and resubmitted in its entirety as document #14 on 10/17/2019 (Thomas, T).
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT A, Consent Form re #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint by Harrell Howard. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Corrected Document as an attachment to his Amended Complaint (Doc. 4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/15/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Corrective Document by Harrell Howard. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed exhibit, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Brady, Scott) Modified to correct event type and edit docket text on 10/15/2019 (Thomas, T).
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 (ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Harrell Howard of Filing Corrective Document re #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Brady, Scott) Modified to indicate electronically filed in error on 10/15/2019 (Thomas, T).
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Answer to Complaint, Answer to Amended Complaint, sent to Van Clifton Seneca on behalf of Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/24/2019. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint , by Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc.(Attorney Van Clifton Seneca added to party Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Seneca, Van) Modified to remove duplicate docket text on 10/10/2019 (Thomas, T).
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Supplemental and Amended Complaint - Collective and Class Action against Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc with Jury Demand filed by Harrell Howard.(aty,Brady, Scott)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harrell Howard. Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Bohrer, Philip)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fleetwood Transportation Services, Inc. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 4, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fleetwood Transportation Services, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4040390) filed by Harrell Howard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Sue, #2 Civil cover sheet, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Harrell Howard(pty:pla))(aty,Bohrer, Philip) (Attachment 3 modified to nonfillable form and replaced on 9/4/2019) (ThomasSld, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrell Howard
Represented By: Scott Earl Brady
Represented By: Amanda E McGowen
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleetwood Transportation Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleetwood Transportation Services Inc
Represented By: Warren Thomas McCollum
Represented By: Van Clifton Seneca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?