Tinsley v. United Fire & Casualty Co et al
Plaintiff: Vickie Tinsley
Defendant: United Fire & Casualty Co, Jason Jacobs, southwest sales, inc and Southwest Sales Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01395
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jason Jacobs, Southwest Sales Inc, United Fire & Casualty Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: Answer filed 7/22/2019 in 30th JDC (Vernon Parish), case number 97,601-C. See PDF image of Attachment #4 of document #6 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER, styled as AFFIDAVIT, of State Pleading Contents by Jason Jacobs, Southwest Sales Inc, United Fire & Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Attorneys, #2 Exhibit Contents of the State Record, #3 Exhibit Certificate of State Clerk, #4 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(aty,Potter, Russell) Modified to edit docket text on 11/13/2019 (Thomas, T). (Attachment 4 modified to rotate pages and replaced on 11/13/2019) (Thomas, T).
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/29/2019. (crt,LaCombe, L)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southwest Sales Inc, United Fire & Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Disclosure)(aty,Potter, Russell)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Andrew P Texada, Russell L Potter on behalf of United Fire & Casualty Co, Southwest Sales inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/12/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 28, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 30th JDC Vernon Parish, Case Number 97,601-C with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4086052) filed by southwest sales, inc, Russell L Potter, Jason Jacobs, United Fire & Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed pleading Petition for Removal, #3 Exhibit United Fire Long Arm Citation, #4 Exhibit Southwest Sales Long Arm Citation, #5 Exhibit Jason Jacobs Long Arm Citation, #6 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #7 Exhibit Plf responses to RFA, #8 Exhibit Plt answers to Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit Plf responses to RFP, #10 Exhibit Dr. DeLapp med rcds, #11 Exhibit Dr. Firmin med rcds, #12 Exhibit Dr. Dole med rcds)(Attorney Russell L Potter added to party Russell L Potter(pty:dft), Attorney Russell L Potter added to party southwest sales, inc(pty:dft), Attorney Russell L Potter added to party Jason Jacobs(pty:dft), Attorney Russell L Potter added to party United Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Potter, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tinsley v. United Fire & Casualty Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire & Casualty Co
Represented By: Andrew P Texada
Represented By: Russell L Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Jacobs
Represented By: Andrew P Texada
Represented By: Russell L Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: southwest sales, inc
Represented By: Andrew P Texada
Represented By: Russell L Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Sales Inc
Represented By: Andrew P Texada
Represented By: Russell L Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Tinsley
Represented By: Wesley J Gralapp
Represented By: Matthew J Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?