Efthemes v. Amguard Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Anthony R. Efthemes and Anthony R Efthemes
Defendant: Apex Transit, LLC, Amguard Insurance Company, Malik Aleem, Amguard Insurance Co and Apex Transit L L C
Case Number: 2:2019cv01409
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Malik Aleem, Amguard Insurance Co, Apex Transit L L C identifying Corporate Parent WestGUARD Insurance Company for Amguard Insurance Co. (aty,Rome, Curt)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/5/2019. (crt,LaCombe, L)
November 2, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
November 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Curt Lucien Rome on behalf of AmGuard Insurance Co, Apex Transit L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/18/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
October 30, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Mitchell, P)
October 30, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Malik Aleem, AmGuard Insurance Co, Apex Transit L L C in the 14th JDC, Parish of Calcasieu. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #14 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal.(crt,Mitchell, P)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th Judicial District Court, Case Number 2019-2391 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4088740) filed by Malik Aleem, Apex Transit, LLC, Amguard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Certificate of Filing, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 List of Parties, #11 List of Pleadings, #12 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #13 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record, #14 Exhibit 3 - State Court Record, #15 Exhibit 4 - State Court Record, #16 Exhibit 5 - State Court Record)(Attorney Curt Lucien Rome added to party Malik Aleem(pty:dft), Attorney Curt Lucien Rome added to party Amguard Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Curt Lucien Rome added to party Apex Transit, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Rome, Curt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Efthemes v. Amguard Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Transit, LLC
Represented By: Curt Lucien Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amguard Insurance Company
Represented By: Curt Lucien Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malik Aleem
Represented By: Curt Lucien Rome
Represented By: James Hurley Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amguard Insurance Co
Represented By: Curt Lucien Rome
Represented By: James Hurley Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Transit L L C
Represented By: Curt Lucien Rome
Represented By: James Hurley Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony R. Efthemes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony R Efthemes
Represented By: John M Jefcoat
Represented By: Kimberly Koye Souriyakhamphong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?