I F G Port Holdings L L C v. Navigation Maritime Bulgare et al
Plaintiff: I F G Port Holdings L L C
Defendant: NAVIGATION MARITIME BULGARE, HOST AGENCY L L C, LUZAR TRADING S A, LUZAR L L C, T Parker Host I N C, Sredna Gora Maritime Ltd, T Parker Host Inc, M/V Sredna Gora and Sagitta Marine S A
Case Number: 2:2019cv01454
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #19 Answer to Complaint and Amended Complaint, sent to John H Musser, V, Tarryn Elizabeth Walsh on behalf of Sredna Gora Maritime Ltd. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/17/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint and #9 Amended Complaint, by Sredna Gora Maritime Ltd.(Attorney John H Musser, V added to party Sredna Gora Maritime Ltd(pty:dft))(aty,Musser, John) Modified on 1/3/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
December 30, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim All Claims Against T. Parker Host brought by Plaintiff with consent by I F G Port Holdings L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Monk, William)
December 16, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. T Parker Host Inc answer due 11/14/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #16 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER) (crt,Jones, P)
December 16, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T Parker Host Inc identifying Corporate Parent T.P. Host LLC for T Parker Host Inc. (aty,Hurley, Grady)
December 16, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Luzar L L C, Luzar Trading S A . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Documents from State Court Record)(aty,Harrell, James)
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended & Supplemental Complaint by Luzar L L C, Luzar Trading S A.(aty,Harrell, James) Modified links on 12/16/2019 (Dunford, T).
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #12 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, sent to Grady S Hurley, William Cuthbert Baldwin, Jennifer Allison David on behalf of T Parker Host Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/27/2019. (crt,Jones, P) Modified on 12/13/2019 to remove Host Agency L L C (Jones, P).
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #11 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim All Claims Against T. Parker Host brought by Plaintiff. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Jones, P)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Luzar L L C, Luzar Trading S A, Sagitta Marine S A by Host Agency L L C.(aty,Hurley, Grady) Modified on 12/13/2019 to add document relation and edit text (Jones, P).
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by T Parker Host Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Hurley, Grady) Modified on 12/13/2019 to edit text (Jones, P).
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Host Agency L L C identifying Corporate Parent T P Host L L C for Host Agency L L C. (aty,Hurley, Grady) Modified text on 12/6/2019 (Dunford, T).
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Host Agency L L C, Luzar L L C, Luzar Trading S A, M V Sredna Gora, Sagitta Marine S A , Sredna Gora Maritime Ltd, T Parker Host Inc filed by I F G Port Holdings L L C.(aty,Monk, William) Modified on 11/25/2019 (Jones, P).
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Luzar Trading S A. (aty,Harrell, James)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Luzar L L C. (aty,Harrell, James)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Navigation Maritime Bulgare identifying Corporate Parent Advance Properties OOD for Navigation Maritime Bulgare. (aty,Musser, John)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/15/2019. (crt,LaCombe, L)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by I F G Port Holdings L L C. (aty,Monk, William)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Gregory Joseph Reda, Ivan M Rodriguez, James A Harrell on behalf of Luzar L L C, Luzar Trading S A. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/22/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 7, 2019 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Host Agency L L C, T Parker Host Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 7, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 19-4675 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4100133) filed by LUZAR TRADING S A, LUZAR L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1) - Documents Served on Removing Defendants, #3 Exhibit 2 (Part 2) - Documents Served on Removing Defendants, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James A Harrell added to party LUZAR L L C(pty:dft), Attorney James A Harrell added to party LUZAR TRADING S A(pty:dft))(aty,Harrell, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: I F G Port Holdings L L C v. Navigation Maritime Bulgare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVIGATION MARITIME BULGARE
Represented By: John H Musser, V
Represented By: Tarryn Elizabeth Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOST AGENCY L L C
Represented By: Jennifer Allison David
Represented By: William Cuthbert Baldwin
Represented By: Grady S Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUZAR TRADING S A
Represented By: James A Harrell
Represented By: Gregory Joseph Reda
Represented By: Ivan M Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUZAR L L C
Represented By: James A Harrell
Represented By: Gregory Joseph Reda
Represented By: Ivan M Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Parker Host I N C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sredna Gora Maritime Ltd
Represented By: John H Musser, V
Represented By: Tarryn Elizabeth Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Parker Host Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Allison David
Represented By: William Cuthbert Baldwin
Represented By: Grady S Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Sredna Gora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagitta Marine S A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I F G Port Holdings L L C
Represented By: Stephen Donald Polito
Represented By: William B Monk
Represented By: Kathleen Thompson Deanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?