McDaniel et al v. A I G Property Casualty Co et al
Plaintiff: Tina McDaniel and Forrest McDaniel
Defendant: Charlotte A. McLendon, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Murphy Trucking, LLC, AIG Property Casualty Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co, A I G Property Casualty Co, Charlotte A McLendon, Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania and Murphy Trucking L L C
Case Number: 2:2019cv01545
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Casualty Insurance Co, Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Progressive Corp by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Corry, Michael) Modified to add corporate parents on 12/23/2019 (Thomas, T).
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania, Murphy Trucking L L C identifying Corporate Parent A I G Property Casualty U S Inc, Corporate Parent A I G Property Casualty Inc to Insurance Co, Corporate Parent American International Group Inc to Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FRCP 7.1 Statement)(aty,Madere, Michael) Modified to edit docket text on 12/11/2019 (Thomas, T).
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Answer to Complaint, sent to Michael P Corry on behalf of Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/24/2019. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Answer to Complaint, sent to Coleman Taylor Organ on behalf of Murphy Trucking L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/24/2019. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania, Murphy Trucking L L C.(Attorney Coleman Taylor Organ added to party Murphy Trucking L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Organ, Coleman)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co.(Attorney Michael P Corry added to party Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Corry, Michael)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/5/2019. (crt,LaCombe, L)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Coleman Taylor Organ, Scott Stephen McCormick, Michael John Madere on behalf of Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/18/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 3, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2019-4891 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4123148) filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 State court petition Petition with Citation, #2 Exhibit Consent of Insurance Co. of the State of PA, #3 Exhibit Consent of Progressive County Mutual Ins. Co., #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Coleman Taylor Organ added to party AIG Property Casualty Company(pty:dft))(aty,Organ, Coleman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel et al v. A I G Property Casualty Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina McDaniel
Represented By: Derrick Glenn Earles
Represented By: David C Laborde
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Alexander
Represented By: Scott F Higgins
Represented By: Shawn Michael Bordelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest McDaniel
Represented By: Derrick Glenn Earles
Represented By: David C Laborde
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Alexander
Represented By: Scott F Higgins
Represented By: Shawn Michael Bordelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte A. McLendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Coleman Taylor Organ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Michael P Corry
Represented By: Christie P Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A I G Property Casualty Co
Represented By: Coleman Taylor Organ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte A McLendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Michael John Madere
Represented By: Coleman Taylor Organ
Represented By: Scott Stephen McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Trucking L L C
Represented By: Michael John Madere
Represented By: Coleman Taylor Organ
Represented By: Scott Stephen McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?