United States of America v. Midkiff et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and USA
Defendant: Leonard C Midkiff and David Curtis Schmidt
Case Number: 2:2019cv01597
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Leonard C Midkiff waiver sent on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (aty,Dozier, Robert)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. David Curtis Schmidt waiver sent on 1/16/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (aty,Dozier, Robert)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Leonard C Midkiff, David Curtis Schmidt (crt,Bunting, M)
December 13, 2019 Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of the United States against Leonard C Medkiff and David Curtis Schmidt (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit (Exhibits 1-6))(Attorney Robert E Dozier added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(aty,Dozier, Robert) Modified docket text on 12/16/2019 (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Midkiff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard C Midkiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Curtis Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert E Dozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Robert E Dozier
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?