Ashcor L L C v. Bryant et al
Plaintiff: Ashcor L L C
Defendant: J D H Oilfield Services L L C, Michael Bryant, Jake Harrington, Beau Higginbotham and Mission Flares & Combustion L L C
Case Number: 2:2020cv00018
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 25 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 7, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 7, 2020 Filing 24 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00209. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
January 7, 2020 Case transferred to District of Western District of Louisiana, Lake Charles Division. Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (AMP) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Dismiss; granting #9 Motion to Transfer. Mission Flares lacks Tennessee contacts, and this Court does not have jurisdiction over it. Separating one Defendant from the rest of the litigation would be inconvenient to the parties and witnesses and would not be in the interests of justice; therefore, it is ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, Lake Charles Division. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 01/07/2020. (AMP) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/16/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 400 - Greeneville before District Judge J Ronnie Greer. The expected length of trial is five (5) days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2021 at 9:00 AM. Dispositive Motions due by 8/18/2020. Utilization of Mediation due by 4/21/2020. Status Report due by 2/18/2020. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 09/17/2019. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rodgers, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge by Ashcor, LLC (Rodgers, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION Motion to Transfer filed by Michael Bryant, Jake Harrington, Beau Higginbotham, JDH Oilfield Services, LLC, Mission Flares and Combustion, LLC. (Miller, Marla) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION Motion to Transfer filed by Ashcor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of R Smith, #2 Exhibit 2- Ward Energy Solutions, #3 Exhibit 3- Ward Alternative Energy LLC, #4 Exhibit 4- Ward Energy Investments, #5 Exhibit 5- Ward Alternative Energy Inc, #6 Exhibit 6- Ward Energy LLC)(Rodgers, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John W. Hargrove on behalf of Plaintiff Ashcor, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 08/14/2019. (KRS) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
August 6, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John W. Hargrove (Filing fee $ 90.00) filed by Ashcor, LLC as to Ashcor, LLC (DJH) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 Receipt # C1016859) by Ashcor, LLC. (DJH) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
August 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Russell J. Stutes, Jr. on behalf of Defendants Michael Bryant, Jake Harrington, Beau Higginbotham, JDH Oilfield Services, LLC, Mission Flares and Combustion, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 08/03/2019. (KRS) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
August 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marla Miller on behalf of Defendants Michael Bryant, Jake Harrington, Beau Higginbotham, JDH Oilfield Services, LLC, Mission Flares and Combustion, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 08/03/2019. (KRS) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Ashcor, LLC re #9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION Motion to Transfer Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Respond in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion to Transfer (Rodgers, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/31/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Marla Miller and Russell Stutes, Jr) (AMP) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent\Non-Consent) (BDG) Order mailed to Miller and Stutes. [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION to Transfer filed by All Defendants. (BDG) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION to Transfer by Michael Bryant, Jake Harrington, Beau Higginbotham, JDH Oilfield Services, LLC, Mission Flares and Combustion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Other)(BDG) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by JDH Oilfield Services, LLC. (BDG) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Mission Flares and Combustion, LLC. (BDG) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/19/2019. (BDG) Order mailed to Miller and Stutes. [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/19/2019. (BDG) Order mailed to Miller and Stutes. [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/19/2019. (BDG) Order mailed to Miller and Stutes. [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 22, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by JDH Oilfield Services, LLC, Mission Flares and Combustion, LLC. (BDG) Notice mailed to Miller and Stutes. [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by JDH Oilfield Services, LLC, Michael Bryant, Jake Harrington, Mission Flares and Combustion, LLC, Beau Higginbotham, #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by JDH Oilfield Services, LLC, Michael Bryant, Jake Harrington, Mission Flares and Combustion, LLC, Beau Higginbotham as to Michael Bryant, Jake Harrington, Beau Higginbotham, JDH Oilfield Services, LLC, Mission Flares and Combustion, LLC (BDG) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Russell J. Stutes, Jr. (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number c1016815) by Michael Bryant, Jake Harrington, Beau Higginbotham, JDH Oilfield Services, LLC, Mission Flares and Combustion, LLC. (BDG) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Marla Miller (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number C1016815) by Michael Bryant, Jake Harrington, Beau Higginbotham, JDH Oilfield Services, LLC, Mission Flares and Combustion, LLC. (BDG) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Chancery Court, case number 19-0421. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number C1016815 ), filed by Mission Flares and Combustion, LLC, Beau Higginbotham, Jake Harrington, Michael Bryant, JDH Oilfield Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Removal Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Cover Letter)(BDG) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 1/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashcor L L C v. Bryant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J D H Oilfield Services L L C
Represented By: Russell J Stutes, Jr
Represented By: Marla Anne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bryant
Represented By: Russell J Stutes, Jr
Represented By: Marla Anne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Harrington
Represented By: Russell J Stutes, Jr
Represented By: Marla Anne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beau Higginbotham
Represented By: Russell J Stutes, Jr
Represented By: Marla Anne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Flares & Combustion L L C
Represented By: Russell J Stutes, Jr
Represented By: Marla Anne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashcor L L C
Represented By: John W Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?