Dupuis v. Tmberline Homes of Louisiana L L C
Plaintiff: Anthony R Dupuis
Defendant: Tmberline Homes of Louisiana, LLC, Timberline Homes of Louisiana L L C, A B C Co, Platinum Homes L L C of Alabama, X Y Z Insurance Co and Timberline Homes of Louisiana Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00152
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER:The Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 2:30 PM is UPSET and RESET for 5/7/2020 at 2:30 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Counsel for plaintiff should initiate the phone conference to include all counsel of record and chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 3/18/2020. (crt,Solari, E)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Benoit, T)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Timberline Homes of Louisiana L L C . (aty,Gaudin, Andre')
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Timberline Homes of Louisiana L L C. (aty,Gaudin, Andre')
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/4/2020. (crt,LaCombe, L)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Andre' C Gaudin on behalf of Timberline Homes of Louisiana L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/18/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 31, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 31, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Timberline Homes of Louisiana L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcaseiu, Case Number 2019-3706 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4170573) filed by Tmberline Homes of Louisiana, LLC.(Attorney Andre' C Gaudin added to party Tmberline Homes of Louisiana, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Gaudin, Andre')

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dupuis v. Tmberline Homes of Louisiana L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony R Dupuis
Represented By: Marshall J Simien, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tmberline Homes of Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Andre' C Gaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timberline Homes of Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Andre' C Gaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platinum Homes L L C of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timberline Homes of Louisiana Inc
Represented By: Andre' C Gaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?