Gonzales v. Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C
Plaintiff: Michelle Gonzales
Defendant: Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C
Case Number: 2:2020cv00642
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C identifying Other Affiliate, G N L C Holdings Inc for Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C. (aty,Ieyoub, Christopher) Modified on 6/26/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C.(Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
June 9, 2020 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Timothy R Richardson on behalf of Michelle Gonzales regarding document filed in error as #4 Service by Publication. Action taken: Modified docket entry to correctly identify as #4 Summons Returned Executed. Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C served on 6/2/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Gonzales. Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C served on 6/2/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (aty,Richardson, Timothy) Modified on 6/9/2020 to correctly identify document (Dauterive, C).
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C. (crt,Dauterive, C)
May 21, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Dauterive, C)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michelle Gonzales. (aty,Richardson, Timothy)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4270299) filed by Michelle Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Verification)(Attorney Timothy R Richardson added to party Michelle Gonzales(pty:selreq))(aty,Richardson, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Gonzales
Represented By: Timothy R Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?