Herrera v. USA
Plaintiff: Arturo Jesus Herrera
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00659
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to run sentence concurrent and correct sentence. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/20/2020 - INTERNAL USE ONLY. (crt,Whidden, C)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00418. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
May 25, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to the Western District of Louisiana. (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/26/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER. It is accordingly ORDERED Petitioner's case is TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 5/25/2020. (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/26/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to run sentence concurrent and correct sentence and apply credit for time served nunc pro tunc, by Arturo Jesus Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/26/2020.]
May 20, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to petitioner. (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/26/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/26/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Arturo Jesus Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Jesus Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?