Lehman v. Guinn et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Lehman
Defendant: Steven VanHook, City of Jennings, Kevin D. Millican, Mr. Henry Guinn, Mr. Bobby Vassuer, Bobby Vassuer, Henry Guinn and Kevin D Millican
Case Number: 2:2020cv00736
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Jones, P)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Henry Guinn, City of Jennings, Kevin D Millican, Steven VanHook, Bobby Vassuer. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(Attorney Robert E Torian added to party Henry Guinn, City of Jennings, Kevin D Millican, Steven VanHook, Bobby Vassuer(pty:dft))(aty,Torian, Robert) Modified on 8/7/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Lehman. Henry Guinn, City of Jennings, Kevin D Millican, Steven VanHook, Bobby Vassuer served 6/10/2020; Answer Due 8/10/2020 (aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 7/9/2020 to edit text, add date served and answer due date (Jones, P).
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Henry Guinn, City of Jennings, Kevin D Millican, Steven VanHook, Bobby Vassuer. (crt,Miletello, A)
June 10, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Jones, P)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Henry Guinn, Kevin D Millican, Steven Vanhook, Bobby Vasseur, City of Jennings with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4289202) filed by Christopher Lehman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Affidavit, #35 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James Edward Sudduth, III added to party Christopher Lehman(pty:pla))(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 6/10/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehman v. Guinn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lehman
Represented By: Pierce Alexander Rapin
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven VanHook
Represented By: Robert E Torian
Represented By: Ben L Mayeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jennings
Represented By: Robert E Torian
Represented By: Ben L Mayeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin D. Millican
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Henry Guinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Bobby Vassuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Vassuer
Represented By: Robert E Torian
Represented By: Ben L Mayeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Guinn
Represented By: Robert E Torian
Represented By: Ben L Mayeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin D Millican
Represented By: Robert E Torian
Represented By: Ben L Mayeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?