Prairie Land Co v. ConocoPhillips Co
Plaintiff: Prairie Land Company and Prairie Land Co
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Co
Case Number: 2:2020cv00748
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by ConocoPhillips Co. (aty,Cerniglia, Michael) Modified on 8/5/2020 to modify docket entry relationship and modify docket text (Miletello, A).
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Prairie Land Co. (crt,Miletello, A)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/31/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Prairie Land Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed pleading)(aty,Keating, Matthew) Modified on 7/28/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
July 28, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #9 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 Response to Removal Order by ConocoPhillips Co (aty,Cerniglia, Michael) Modified on 7/9/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by ConocoPhillips Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed order)(aty,Burvant, Robert) Modified on 7/7/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ConocoPhillips Co identifying Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips for ConocoPhillips Co. (aty,Burvant, Robert) Modified on 6/26/2020 to modify docket text(Miletello, A).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/15/2020. (crt,LaCombe, L)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/15/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Eric E Jarrell, Robert J Burvant, Michael J Cerniglia on behalf of ConocoPhillips Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/29/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 12, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu, Case Number 2020-1482E (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4291910) filed by ConocoPhillips Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Attachment 1 - Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment 2 - Notice of Removal, #5 Attachment 3 - Notice of Removal)(Attorney Michael J Cerniglia added to party ConocoPhillips Co(pty:dft))(aty,Cerniglia, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prairie Land Co v. ConocoPhillips Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prairie Land Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prairie Land Co
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Keating
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Wesley Alan Romero
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Matthew Martin Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Co
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?