West v. Northrup Grumman Systems Corp
Plaintiff: Samantha A West
Defendant: Northrup Grumman Corp and Northrup Grumman Systems Corp
Case Number: 2:2020cv00779
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Samantha A West. Northrop Grumman Systems Corp served 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (aty,Sudduth, James) Modified to include service date and answer due date on 7/9/2020 (Bunting, M).
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Northrup Grumman Systems Corp. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 19, 2020 Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified on 6/22/2020 (Bunting, M).
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northrup Grumman Systems Corp with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4298500) filed by Samantha A West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James Edward Sudduth, III added to party Samantha A West(pty:pla))(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified docket text on 6/22/2020 (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Northrup Grumman Systems Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha A West
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Brent Alan Hawkins
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Represented By: Pierce Alexander Rapin
Represented By: Derrick D Kee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrup Grumman Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrup Grumman Systems Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?