USA et al v Sauer Inc et al
Plaintiff: KRANE DEVELOPMENT, INC., D/B/A ADS SERVICES, USA for the use and benefit of Krane Development Inc doing business as A D S Services and E S A South Inc
Not Classified By Court: ESA SOUTH, INC.
3Rd Party Defendant: A X I S Insurance Services L L C and O H C Environmental Engineering Inc
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Sauer Inc and Federal Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2020cv00865
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1352
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE REGARDING HURRICANE LAURA: The Lake Charles area sustained extensive damage due to Hurricane Laura, including the Edwin F. Hunter, Jr. Courthouse. All proceedings and deadlines due within the next 30 days before Judge Cain are suspended. All proceedings and deadlines due before Magistrate Judge Kay remain as previously set. The court will advise of resettings in due course on a per-case basis via CM/ECF. Parties are encouraged to electronically file for relief or extensions, but if unable to do so, to call chambers and leave a message. Your message will be responded to promptly. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 28, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS ISSUED as to third parties A X I S Insurance Services L L C, O H C Environmental Engineering Inc. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 28, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against O H C Environmental Engineering Inc, A X I S Insurance Services L L C by Sauer Inc, Federal Insurance Co.(aty,Hicks, Michael) Modified text on 8/28/2020 (Dunford, T).
August 28, 2020 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AXIS Insurance Services, LLC, requested by Sauer Inc. (aty,Hicks, Michael)
August 28, 2020 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OHC Environmental Engineering, Inc., requested by Sauer Inc. (aty,Hicks, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Federal Insurance Co answer due 8/28/2020; Sauer Inc answer due 8/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/24/2020. (crt,Roaix, G)
August 21, 2020 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Federal Insurance Co, Sauer Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Frederick, Zelma) Modified on 8/21/2020 (Thomas, T).
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Federal Insurance Co. and Sauer, Inc., answers due 8/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/3/2020. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sauer Inc identifying Corporate Parent Sauer Holdings Inc for Sauer Inc. (aty,Hicks, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Chubb I N A Holdings, Inc, Corporate Parent Chubb Ltd for Federal Insurance Co. (aty,Hicks, Michael) Modified to edit docket text on 8/3/2020 (Thomas, T).
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Michael B Hicks, Zelma M Frederick on behalf of Federal Insurance Co, Sauer Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/13/2020. (crt,Dunford, T)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint with consent by Federal Insurance Co, Sauer Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Michael B Hicks added to party Federal Insurance Co, Sauer Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Hicks, Michael) Modified text on 7/30/2020 (Dunford, T).
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by USA. (aty,Odom, John)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Joseph Passeretti for E S A South Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/15/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by E S A South Inc. (aty,Odom, John)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA, E S A South Inc. Federal Insurance Co served on 7/10/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (aty,Odom, John)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA, E S A South Inc. Sauer Inc served on 7/10/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (aty,Odom, John)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Charles Edward Reynolds, II for E S A South Inc and USA for the use and benefit of Krane Development Inc doing business as A D S Services. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/10/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Joe Passeretti Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4319162) by E S A South Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Odom, John) Modified on 7/15/2020 (Thomas, T).
July 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Charles E. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/9/2020. (crt,Dunford, T)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Certificate of good standing filed by E S A South Inc, USA regarding #4 MOTION for Charles E. Reynoldsto Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4317633) . (aty,Odom, John)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency to John S Odom, Jr on behalf of E S A South Inc, USA regarding #4 MOTION for Charles E. Reynoldsto Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4317633). Reason: The above item requires a certificate of good standing. Please refer to LR83.2.6 for more specific requirements. (crt,Thomas, T)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Charles E. Reynoldsto Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4317633) by USA, E S A South Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/9/2020. (aty,Odom, John) Modified to reflect deficient status and add filer on 7/9/2020 (Thomas, T). Modified to remove deficient status and indicate certificate of good standing filed as document #6 on 7/9/2020 (Thomas, T).
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to John S Odom, Jr on behalf of E S A South Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/23/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Insurance Co, Sauer Inc. (crt,Thomas, T)
July 8, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sauer Inc, Federal Insurance Co (Filing Fee: $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4316811) filed by USA for the use and benefit of Krane Development Inc d/b/a A D S Services, E S A South Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PP Bonds for Volar Barracks Renovation, #2 Exhibit Composite of subcontract agreements, #3 Exhibit OHC ADS contract Volar Barracks Ft Polk, #4 Exhibit OHC Environmental Engineering Subcontract, #5 Exhibit Subcontract Agreement, #6 Exhibit ESA Letter Regarding Claim on Bond, #7 Exhibit ADS Services Letter Regarding Claim on Bond, #8 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John S Odom, Jr added to party ESA SOUTH, INC.(pty:selreq), Attorney John S Odom, Jr added to party KRANE DEVELOPMENT, INC., D/B/A ADS SERVICES(pty:pla))(aty,Odom, John) . Modified to add receipt number and edit docket text on 7/9/2020 (Thomas, T).
July 8, 2020 ELECTRONIC PAYMENT of Civil Case filing fee by ESA SOUTH, INC., KRANE DEVELOPMENT, INC., D/B/A ADS SERVICES. ( Filing Fee: $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4316811) . (aty,Odom, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA et al v Sauer Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ESA SOUTH, INC.
Represented By: John S Odom, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRANE DEVELOPMENT, INC., D/B/A ADS SERVICES
Represented By: John S Odom, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA for the use and benefit of Krane Development Inc doing business as A D S Services
Represented By: Charles Edward Reynolds, II
Represented By: John S Odom, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E S A South Inc
Represented By: Charles Edward Reynolds, II
Represented By: John S Odom, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Passeretti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: A X I S Insurance Services L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: O H C Environmental Engineering Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Sauer Inc
Represented By: Zelma M Frederick
Represented By: Michael B Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Federal Insurance Co
Represented By: Zelma M Frederick
Represented By: Michael B Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?