Phillips et al v. Sulzer Turbo Services New Orleans Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nikki Lynn Phillips and Brent Phillips
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co, Sulzer Turbo Services New Orleans Inc, Westlake Petrochemical L L C, X Y Z Insurance Co, Eagle U S 2 L L C, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co and Sulzer Turbo Services Houston Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01016
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Benoit, T)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING HURRICANE LAURA: The Lake Charles area sustained extensive damage due to Hurricane Laura, including the Edwin F. Hunter, Jr. Courthouse. All proceedings and deadlines due within the next 30 days before Judge Cain are suspended. All proceedings and deadlines due before Magistrate Judge Kay remain as previously set. The court will advise of resettings in due course on a per-case basis via CM/ECF. Parties are encouraged to electronically file for relief or extensions, but if unable to do so, to call chambers and leave a message. Your message will be responded to promptly. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Sulzer Turbo Services Houston Inc identifying Corporate Parent Sulzer U S Holdings Inc and Sulzer A G for Sulzer Turbo Services Houston Inc; Corporate Parent X L Specialty Insurance Co, X L Reinsurance America Inc, A X A X L Insurers, X L Bermuda Ltd, X L Group Ltd, A X A S A, A X A Assurance Vie Mutuelle for Indian Harbor Insurance Co. (aty,Smith, Jackson) Modified to add corporate parents on 8/26/2020 (Dunford, T).
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #2 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Jackson McLaurin Smith on behalf of Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Sulzer Turbo Services Houston Inc. Show Cause Response due by 9/8/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eagle U S 2 L L C, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co, Westlake Petrochemical L L C identifying Eagle Spinco Inc, Axiall Corp, Lagoon L L C, Westlake Chemical Corp for Eagle U S 2 L L C; Starr Global Financial Inc, Starr Global Holdings A G for Starr Indemnity & Liabililty Co; Westlake Polymers L L C, Westlake Chemical Investment Inc, Westlake Longview Corp, Westlake Chemical Investments Inc, Westlake Olefins Corp, Westlake Chemical Corp, Westlake Vinyl Corp for Westlake Petrochemical L L C. (aty,Landry, Catherine) Modified on 8/14/2020 to add affiliates (Jones, P).
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/13/2020. (crt,LaCombe, L)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/10/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Ernest P Gieger, Jr, John E W Baay, II, Jackson McLaurin Smith on behalf of Eagle U S 2 L L C, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co, Sulzer Turbo Services Houston Inc, Westlake Petrochemical L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/24/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
August 10, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Jones, P)
August 10, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint and Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Eagle U S 2 L L C, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co, Westlake Petrochemical L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHMENT #1 TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(Attorney Catherine M Landry and Mandy Ann Simon added to party Eagle U S 2 L L C, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co, Westlake Petrochemical L L C(pty:dft))(crt,Jones, P)
August 10, 2020 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Sulzer Turbo Services Houston, Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHMENT #1 TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (crt,Jones, P) Modified on 8/10/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
August 10, 2020 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eagle U S 2 L L C, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co, Sulzer Turbo Services Houston, Inc. filed by Brent Phillips, Nikki Lynn Phillips. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHMENT #1 TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(crt,Jones, P)
August 10, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sulzer Turbo Services New Orleans, Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY SEE ATTACHMENT #1 TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(Attorney John Nickerson Chappuis added to party Sulzer Turbo Services New Orleans, Inc(pty:dft))(crt,Jones, P)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14TH JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2019-4567 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4351363) filed by Sulzer Turbo Services Houston Inc, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Westlake Petrochemical L L c, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jackson McLaurin Smith added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Sulzer Turbo Services Houston Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Smith, Jackson) Modified on 8/10/2020 to add filers (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips et al v. Sulzer Turbo Services New Orleans Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Lynn Phillips
Represented By: Brian Lee King
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Milazzo, III
Represented By: Jason F Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Phillips
Represented By: Brian Lee King
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Milazzo, III
Represented By: Jason F Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sulzer Turbo Services New Orleans Inc
Represented By: John Nickerson Chappuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Petrochemical L L C
Represented By: John E W Baay, II
Represented By: Catherine M Landry
Represented By: Ernest P Gieger, Jr
Represented By: Jackson McLaurin Smith
Represented By: Mandy Ann Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle U S 2 L L C
Represented By: John E W Baay, II
Represented By: Catherine M Landry
Represented By: Ernest P Gieger, Jr
Represented By: Jackson McLaurin Smith
Represented By: Mandy Ann Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Co
Represented By: John E W Baay, II
Represented By: Ernest P Gieger, Jr
Represented By: William A Barousse
Represented By: Jackson McLaurin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Co
Represented By: John E W Baay, II
Represented By: Catherine M Landry
Represented By: Ernest P Gieger, Jr
Represented By: Jackson McLaurin Smith
Represented By: Mandy Ann Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sulzer Turbo Services Houston Inc
Represented By: John E W Baay, II
Represented By: Ernest P Gieger, Jr
Represented By: William A Barousse
Represented By: Jackson McLaurin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?