USA v A P T I M Federal Services L L C et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, APTIM Federal Services, LLC, A P T I M Federal Services L L C and Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2020cv01414
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. A P T I M Federal Services L L C waiver sent on 11/3/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (aty,LeMieux, Christopher)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co waiver sent on 11/3/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (aty,LeMieux, Christopher)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to A P T I M Federal Services L L C, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (crt,Jones, P)
November 2, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Jones, P)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A P T I M Federal Services L L C, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4444858) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope C, #4 Civil cover sheet, #5 Proposed summons/writ, #6 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Christopher Kyle LeMieux added to party USA)(aty,LeMieux, Christopher) Modified on 11/2/2020 to edit text (Jones, P). Modified on 11/4/2020 (Whidden, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v A P T I M Federal Services L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APTIM Federal Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A P T I M Federal Services L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Michael David Lane
Represented By: Christopher Kyle LeMieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?