Marin v. Hebert
Plaintiff: Lisvan Romero Marin
Defendant: Douglas Hebert
Case Number: 2:2021cv00208
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT granting #7 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 3/17/2021. (crt,Benoit, T)
March 17, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Moot. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Taylor, L)
March 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Moot. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (crt,Taylor, L)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Moot by Douglas Hebert. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Text of proposed order, #3 Exhibit)(Attorney Jennifer B Frederick added to party Douglas Hebert(pty:dft))(aty,Frederick, Jennifer)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Roberto Carlos Rivero Leyva, Oberto Sosa Delgado, Gualdimir Canete Aguilar, Jose Andres Vega Chacon, Richard Castaneda Rios, Roberto Hernandez Ramirez, Adriel Blanco Campos, Yordel Hernandez Alfonso, Pablo Camejo Reyes, David Gonzalez Alfonso deArmas, Yosdeny Guerra Martinez, Yulian Ernesto Marino Aguilar, Leandro Pupo-Carralero, Orlando Espinosa-Labrada, Rolando Ramirez Guerrero, Leodannis Ortiz Perez, Reiniel Fonseca Gonzalez, Mario Legra Saing, Lisvan Romero Marin, Ricardo Sosa Garcia, Allen Parish Public Safety Complex 7340 Hwy 26 W Oberlin, LA 70655, re: (2 in 2:21-cv-00278-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00296-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00270-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00291-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00275-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00210-TAD-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00282-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00212-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00275-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00296-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, Notice of Corrective Action, (2 in 2:21-cv-00268-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00291-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00264-TAD-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00277-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00274-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00270-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00209-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00285-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00264-TAD-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00208-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00281-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00278-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00294-TAD-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00279-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (3 in 2:21-cv-00262-JDC-KK) Sec P - Deficiency Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00283-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00294-TAD-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00274-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00283-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00279-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00268-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00285-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00282-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, returned marked: No Mail Receptacle. Action taken: Re-mailed to P O Box 278 Oberlin, LA 70655. (crt,Whidden, C)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Warden Allen Parish Public Safety Complex served on 2/1/2021 and US Attorney General served on 2/8/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney served on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER denying 1 Motion for Order to Show Cause. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: See document #2 to view PDF image. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/28/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, ICE District Director, Allen Parish Public Safety Complex. (crt,Haik, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2021: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (Chicola, C).
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/28/2021. (crt,Haik, K)
January 22, 2021 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Lisvan Romero Marin in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 64635008432. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Lisvan Romero Marin. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture motion relief requested within pdf of Doc 1 Petition. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/22/2021. (crt,Devillier, W) Modified to assign document number on 1/25/2021 (Devillier, W).
January 22, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marin v. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Hebert
Represented By: Jennifer B Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisvan Romero Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?