Ramos v. Hebert
Plaintiff: Yosiel Garcia Ramos
Defendant: Douglas Hebert
Case Number: 2:2021cv00260
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Douglas Hebert. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Release, #3 Proposed order)(Attorney Jennifer B Frederick added to party Douglas Hebert(pty:dft))(aty,Frederick, Jennifer)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to District Director ICE served on 2/10/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney General served on 2/11/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Warden Allen Parish Public Safety Complex served on 2/8/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney served on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED by certified mail as to Warden - Allen Parish Public Safety Complex, District Director ICE, U S Attorney and U S Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts)(crt,Chicola, C)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying 1 Motion for Order to Show Cause. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture additional order within 2 Memorandum Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/3/2021. (crt,Chicola, C) Modified to add document number on 2/3/2021 (Chicola, C).
January 27, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Devillier, W)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Yosiel Garcia Ramos. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture motion relief requested within pdf of Doc 1 Petition. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/27/2021. (crt,Devillier, W) Modified to assign document number on 2/2/2021 (Devillier, W).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Hebert
Represented By: Jennifer B Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yosiel Garcia Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?