Saing v. Hebert
Plaintiff: Mario Legra Saing
Defendant: Douglas Hebert
Case Number: 2:2021cv00285
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney General served on 2/17/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Roberto Carlos Rivero Leyva, Oberto Sosa Delgado, Gualdimir Canete Aguilar, Jose Andres Vega Chacon, Richard Castaneda Rios, Roberto Hernandez Ramirez, Adriel Blanco Campos, Yordel Hernandez Alfonso, Pablo Camejo Reyes, David Gonzalez Alfonso deArmas, Yosdeny Guerra Martinez, Yulian Ernesto Marino Aguilar, Leandro Pupo-Carralero, Orlando Espinosa-Labrada, Rolando Ramirez Guerrero, Leodannis Ortiz Perez, Reiniel Fonseca Gonzalez, Mario Legra Saing, Lisvan Romero Marin, Ricardo Sosa Garcia, Allen Parish Public Safety Complex 7340 Hwy 26 W Oberlin, LA 70655, re: (2 in 2:21-cv-00278-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00296-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00270-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00291-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00275-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00210-TAD-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00282-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00212-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00275-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00296-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, Notice of Corrective Action, (2 in 2:21-cv-00268-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00291-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00264-TAD-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00277-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00274-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00270-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00209-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00285-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00264-TAD-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00208-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00281-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00278-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00294-TAD-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00279-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (3 in 2:21-cv-00262-JDC-KK) Sec P - Deficiency Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00283-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00294-TAD-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00274-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00283-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00279-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00268-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, (2 in 2:21-cv-00285-JDC-KK) Sec P - Service Order, (2 in 2:21-cv-00282-JDC-KK) Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, returned marked: No Mail Receptacle. Action taken: Re-mailed to P O Box 278 Oberlin, LA 70655. (crt,Whidden, C)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Warden Allen Parish Public Safety Complex and District Director ICE served on 2/11/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney served on 2/10/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED by certified mail as to Warden Allen Parish Public Safety Complex, District Director ICE, U S Attorney and U S Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts)(crt,Chicola, C)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying 1 Motion for Order to Show Cause. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture additional order within 2 Memorandum Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/8/2021. (crt,Chicola, C) Modified to add document number on 2/9/2021 (Chicola, C).
January 27, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Devillier, W)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Mario Legra Saing. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture motion relief requested within pdf of Doc 1 Petition. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/27/2021. (crt,Thomas, T) Modified to assign document number on 2/3/2021 (Devillier, W).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saing v. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Legra Saing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?