Johnson et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Plaintiff: Cynthia Darce and Quentin Johnson
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Special Master: Cade Richard Cole and Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Case Number: 2:2021cv00502
Filed: February 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Rinn, Christopher)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 4/26/2021. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 3/30/2021. (crt,Keifer, K)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co naming State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co as a corporate parent. (aty,Rinn, Christopher) Modified on 3/26/2021 to add corporate parent (Jones, P).
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Christopher James Rinn added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Rinn, Christopher)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quentin Johnson, Cynthia Darce. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (aty,Checki, Lauren)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Dauterive, C)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 28, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire & Casualty Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4588354) filed by Quentin Johnson, Cynthia Darce. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ Summons)(Attorney Lauren Elizabeth Checki added to party Cynthia Darce(pty:pla), Attorney Lauren Elizabeth Checki added to party Quentin Johnson(pty:pla))(aty,Checki, Lauren) (Attachment 2 replaced with properly formatted pdf document on 3/1/2021) (Dauterive, C). Modified on 3/1/2021 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Darce
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Checki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin Johnson
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Checki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Represented By: Christopher James Rinn
Represented By: V Ed McGuire, III
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?