Rutherford v. Allied Trust Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Justin Rutherford
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Co
Special Master: Cade Richard Cole and Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Case Number: 2:2021cv00532
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER, Before the Court is a Motion to Compel Appraisal and Appoint Umpire(Doc. 11) Plaintiff shall file a response no later than 5/6/2021. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 4/29/2021. (crt,Petrofes, T)
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Appoint Umpire by Allied Trust Insurance Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit B)(aty,Mineo, John)
April 28, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #11 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Appoint Umpire. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Allied Trust Insurance Co.(aty,Mineo, John)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Derek Clinton Brasher (aty,Brasher, Derek)
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allied Trust Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Allied Trust Holdings, LLC for Allied Trust Insurance Co. (aty,Mineo, John)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Allied Trust Insurance Co answer due 4/14/2021. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 3/18/2021. (crt,Benoit, T)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to John Dante Mineo, IV on behalf of Allied Trust Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/1/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Allied Trust Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney John Dante Mineo, IV added to party Allied Trust Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Mineo, John)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Rutherford. Allied Trust Insurance Co served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021. (aty,Brasher, Derek)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Dauterive, C)
March 3, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allied Trust Insurance Co. (crt,Dauterive, C)
March 2, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Dauterive, C)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allied Trust Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4592186) filed by Justin Rutherford. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Derek Clinton Brasher added to party Justin Rutherford(pty:pla))(aty,Brasher, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutherford v. Allied Trust Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Rutherford
Represented By: Derek Clinton Brasher
Represented By: Joseph Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Co
Represented By: Brett Foster Willie
Represented By: Rachel Long Flarity
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Riche
Represented By: John Dante Mineo, IV
Represented By: Matthew D Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?