Guillory v. Guillory et al
Plaintiff: Arthur John Guillory
Defendant: Lake Charles Correctional Center, Officer Guillory, Warden Ford, Captain Mitchell and Major Lea
Case Number: 2:2021cv00700
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Arthur John Guillory. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms.Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 4/21/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 3/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Form, #2 Application to proceed IFP form)(crt,Reeves, T)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/18/2021. (crt,Taylor, L)
March 15, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Taylor, L)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Ford, Guillory, Lake Charles Correctional Center, Lea, Mitchell filed by Arthur John Guillory. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, # 2 Claim , # 3 Claim , (4) Envelope)(crt,Chavis, J) . Modified on 3/18/2021 to reflect submission as Deficient - Not on Approved Form (Taylor, L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillory v. Guillory et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Charles Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Guillory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Lea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur John Guillory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?