Coleman Roofing L L C v. Mystic Marketing Associates L L C et al
Plaintiff: Coleman Roofing, LLC and Coleman Roofing L L C
Defendant: Mystic Marketing Associates, LLC, Adria Systems L L C, Mel Corvacho and Mystic Marketing Associates L L C
Case Number: 2:2021cv01160
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Adria Systems L L C, Mystic Marketing Associates L L C . (Attachments: #1 State court petition, #2 State court citation, #3 Exhibit Motion for Extension, #4 State court return of service, #5 Exhibit Order on Motion for Extension, #6 Exhibit State Court Documents, #7 Certificate of State Court Documents)(aty,Venezia, John) Modified on 6/15/2021to modify filers. (Crick, S).
June 1, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Adria Systems L L C answer due 5/7/2021; Mystic Marketing Associates L L C answer due 5/7/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #4 to #7 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Crick, S)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 30 day extension of time to respond signed by State Court Judge David A Ritchie on 4/19/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #5 to #7 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 6/1/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coleman Roofing L L C. (aty,Floyd, Donnie)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Adria Systems L L C, Mystic Marketing Associates L L C identifying Corporate Parent Wyndell Financial L L C for Mystic Marketing Associates L L C. (aty,Venezia, John) Modified on 5/12/2021to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/5/2021. (crt,LaCombe, L)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/3/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 (ISSUED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Donnie L Floyd on behalf of Coleman Roofing L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/17/2021. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 5/18/2021 to show entered in error. (Mitchell, P)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-750 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4658407) filed by Mystic Marketing Associates L L C. (Attachments: #1 State court petition D1, #2 Affidavit D2, #3 Exhibit D2)(Attorney John Armand Venezia added to party Mystic Marketing Associates L L C(pty:selreq))(aty,Venezia, John) Modified on 4/30/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
April 30, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman Roofing L L C v. Mystic Marketing Associates L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coleman Roofing, LLC
Represented By: Donnie L Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coleman Roofing L L C
Represented By: Donnie L Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mystic Marketing Associates, LLC
Represented By: John Armand Venezia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adria Systems L L C
Represented By: John Armand Venezia
Represented By: John E Sudderth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel Corvacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mystic Marketing Associates L L C
Represented By: John Armand Venezia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?