Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Cookies Lounge L L C
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc and Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Cookie's Lounge, LLC d/b/a Meek's Lounge & Bistro, Tomika Duhon-Bilbo and Cookies Lounge L L C doing business as Meeks Lounge & Bistro
Case Number: 2:2021cv01485
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Cookies Lounge L L C served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (aty,Tarver, Dorothy)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Tomika Duhon-Bilbo served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (aty,Tarver, Dorothy)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cookies Lounge L L C, Tomika Duhon-Bilbo. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 1, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions Inc . (aty,Tarver, Dorothy) Modified on 6/1/2021 (Thomas, T).
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4691051) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons-Cookie's Lounge, LLC d/b/a Meek's Lounge & Bistro, #3 Summons-Tomika Duhon-Bilbo)(Attorney Dorothy L Tarver added to party Joe Hand Promotions, Inc(pty:pla))(aty,Tarver, Dorothy) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/1/2021) (Thomas, T). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/1/2021) (Thomas, T). (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/1/2021) (Thomas, T). (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/1/2021) (Thomas, T). Modified docs to non- fillable forms and to put complaint as main document an civil cover sheet as attachment #1 on 6/1/2021 (Thomas, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Cookies Lounge L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc
Represented By: Dorothy L Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Dorothy L Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cookie's Lounge, LLC d/b/a Meek's Lounge & Bistro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomika Duhon-Bilbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cookies Lounge L L C doing business as Meeks Lounge & Bistro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?