Graciani v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sandy Catala Graciani
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv02278
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER Record Received electronically by Eastern District of Louisiana on 8/25/2021, assigned case number 2:21-cv-01612. (crt,Reeves, T)
August 25, 2021 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from Western District of Louisiana to Eastern District of Louisiana. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/24/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana by Sandy Catala Graciani. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 8/16/2021 (Miletello, A).
August 16, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/16/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/5/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/4/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 2, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sandy Catala Graciani. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 In Forma Pauperis, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Sandy Catala Graciani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Attorney Benjamin M Misko added to party Sandy Catala Graciani(pty:pla))(aty,Misko, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graciani v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Catala Graciani
Represented By: Benjamin M Misko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?