Sonnier v. Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Justin Sonnier and Megan Sonnier
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2021cv02409
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Donovan, James)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/11/2021. (crt,LaCombe, L)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/10/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corp for Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance. (aty,Donovan, James) Modified corporate parent on 8/10/2021 (Bunting, M).
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th Judicial District Court Calcasieu, Case Number 2021-2225 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4769801) filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Attorney James L Donovan, Jr added to party Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance(pty:dft))(aty,Donovan, James)
August 10, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY - PDF of document found attached to #1 Notice o Removal (filed 14th JDC, 7/27/2021), attachment #2.(crt,Bunting, M)
August 10, 2021 Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonnier v. Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Sonnier
Represented By: Sophia Juliana Johnson
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Sonnier
Represented By: Sophia Juliana Johnson
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Co
Represented By: James L Donovan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?